Heng Ren Investments LP et al v. Sino Agro Food, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Heng Ren Investments LP, Heng Ren Silk Road Investments LLC and Arne H. Fredly
Defendant: Yip Kun Solomon Lee and Lee Yip Kun Solomon
Nominal Defendant: Sino Agro Food, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv09236
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/18/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
December 10, 2021 Filing 17 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/18/2021 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bryan Nilsen, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, As stated on the record during the teleconference held yesterday: Defendant Sino Agro Food Inc. shall file any opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to appoint a temporary receiver, see Case No. 19-CV-2680, ECF No. 115, no later than December 9, 2021. Defendant Sino Agro Food Inc. is cautioned that a corporation may appear in federal court only through licensed counsel, and "where a corporation repeatedly fails to appear by counsel, a default judgment may be entered against it." Grace v. Bank Leumi Tr. Co. of N.Y., 443 F.3d 180, 192 (2d Cir. 2006) (internal quotation marks omitted). No later than November 22, 2021, Plaintiffs shall serve Defendant Sino Agro Food Inc. (through its registered agent) and Defendant Lee Yip Kun Solomon (by email)with (1) a copy of the motion to appoint a temporary receiver and all supporting papers; and (2) a copy of this Order. No later than November 23, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file proof of such service on the docket. Richard Babnick and his law firm, Sichenzia Ross Ference LLP, are granted leave to withdraw as counsel from case number 19-CV-2680. The Clerk of Court is directed to update the docket accordingly. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 12/9/2021), Attorney Richard Johnnie Babnick, Jr terminated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/19/21) (yv)
November 18, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jesse M. Furman: Conference held via teleconference on 11/18/2021. Angus Ni for Plaintiffs. Richard Babnick for Defendant Sino Agro Food Inc. (only in 19cv2680). Court reporter present. (ab)
November 12, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sino Agro Food, Inc.. (sj)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties appear for a conference on November 18, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. to discuss how to proceed in these two related cases. In particular, the parties should be prepared to discuss (1) whether the Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over the later filed case, 21-CV-9236, given that it was filed as a new case rather than as a motion to enforce the settlement agreement and (2) how to handle the motion for appointment of a receiver. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Rule 2(B) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. Counsel should review and comply with the rules regarding teleconferences in the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases, including Rule 2(B)(i), which requires the parties, no later than 24 hours before the conference, to send a joint email to the Court with a list of counsel who may speak during the teleconference and the telephone numbers from which counsel expect to join the call. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/12/2021) (kv)
November 12, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-02680-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
November 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Angus Ni to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant's name as to whom the summons request is for must match exactly as pleading on PDF and docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
November 12, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Lorna G. Schofield is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
November 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so redesignated. (aea)
November 11, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sino Agro Food Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arne H. Fredly, Heng Ren Investments LP, Heng Ren Silk Road Investments LLC..(Ni, Angus)
November 11, 2021 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yip Kun Solomon Lee, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arne H. Fredly, Heng Ren Investments LP, Heng Ren Silk Road Investments LLC..(Ni, Angus) Modified on 11/12/2021 (sj).
November 11, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Heng Ren Investments LP, Heng Ren Silk Road Investments LLC..(Ni, Angus)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ni, Angus)
November 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Angus Ni. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
November 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Angus Ni. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Arne H. Fredly; Yip Kun Solomon Lee. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
November 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Angus Ni to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the similar case information is on the incorrect section of the PDF, multiple Citizenship Plaintiff and Defendant codes were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Randel Lewis in Support re: #4 MOTION to Appoint Temporary Receiver Over Defendant Sino Agro Food, Inc... Document filed by Arne H. Fredly, Heng Ren Investments LP, Heng Ren Silk Road Investments LLC..(Ni, Angus)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Carl Fredrik Danielsson in Support re: #4 MOTION to Appoint Temporary Receiver Over Defendant Sino Agro Food, Inc... Document filed by Arne H. Fredly, Heng Ren Investments LP, Heng Ren Silk Road Investments LLC..(Ni, Angus)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Henry Sun in Support re: #4 MOTION to Appoint Temporary Receiver Over Defendant Sino Agro Food, Inc... Document filed by Arne H. Fredly, Heng Ren Investments LP, Heng Ren Silk Road Investments LLC..(Ni, Angus)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Angus F. Ni in Support re: #4 MOTION to Appoint Temporary Receiver Over Defendant Sino Agro Food, Inc... Document filed by Arne H. Fredly, Heng Ren Investments LP, Heng Ren Silk Road Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through Z).(Ni, Angus)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION to Appoint Temporary Receiver Over Defendant Sino Agro Food, Inc.. . Document filed by Arne H. Fredly, Heng Ren Investments LP, Heng Ren Silk Road Investments LLC..(Ni, Angus)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Temporary Receiver Over Defendant Sino Agro Food, Inc.. Document filed by Arne H. Fredly, Heng Ren Investments LP, Heng Ren Silk Road Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Ni, Angus)
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-02680. Document filed by Arne H. Fredly, Heng Ren Investments LP, Heng Ren Silk Road Investments LLC..(Ni, Angus)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ni, Angus) Modified on 11/9/2021 (jgo).
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yip Kun Solomon Lee, Sino Agro Food, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25306082)Document filed by Heng Ren Investments LP, Arne H. Fredly, Heng Ren Silk Road Investments LLC..(Ni, Angus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heng Ren Investments LP et al v. Sino Agro Food, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heng Ren Investments LP
Represented By: Angus Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heng Ren Silk Road Investments LLC
Represented By: Angus Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arne H. Fredly
Represented By: Angus Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yip Kun Solomon Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Yip Kun Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Sino Agro Food, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?