KIN & Company Inc. v. Matte Projects LLC
Plaintiff: KIN & Company Inc.
Defendant: Matte Projects LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv09317
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/3/2021) (vfr)
December 3, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Matte Projects LLC answer due 1/21/2022. (vfr)
December 2, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Sarah M. Matz, Esq. dated December 2, 2021. Document filed by Matte Projects LLC..(Matz, Sarah)
December 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Michal Matz on behalf of Matte Projects LLC..(Matz, Sarah)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Matte Projects LLC served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty (Sec. of State). Document filed by KIN & Company Inc...(Pohl, David)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matte Projects LLC..(pc)
November 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Matthew Pohl. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1330; Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); Dollar Demand $86,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
November 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pohl, David)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Matte Projects LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by KIN & Company Inc...(Pohl, David)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matte Projects LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25318657)Document filed by KIN & Company Inc...(Pohl, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KIN & Company Inc. v. Matte Projects LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIN & Company Inc.
Represented By: David Matthew Pohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matte Projects LLC
Represented By: Sarah Michal Matz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?