First Look Institute, Inc. et al v. Defense Threat Reduction Agency
Plaintiff: First Look Institute, Inc. and Sharon Lerner
Defendant: Defense Threat Reduction Agency
Case Number: 1:2021cv09337
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #14 MOTION for Victoria J. Noble to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25494520. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California. We do not accept certificates from a state bar registrar for this state.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
December 20, 2021 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Victoria J. Noble to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25494520. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by First Look Institute, Inc., Sharon Lerner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of PHV Admission, #2 Proposed Order for PHV Admission).(Noble, Victoria) Modified on 12/21/2021 (bcu).
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Defense Threat Reduction Agency..(Levine, Danielle)
December 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Judith Levine on behalf of Defense Threat Reduction Agency..(Levine, Danielle)
December 13, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order, Dkt. No. 7, dated November 17, 2021 served on Defendant Defense Threat Reduction Agency on November 30, 2021. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by First Look Institute, Inc., Sharon Lerner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipts).(Greenberger, Debra)
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Defense Threat Reduction Agency served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by First Look Institute, Inc.; Sharon Lerner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipts).(Greenberger, Debra)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by January 10, 2022, e-mail a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscomis.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscomis.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by January 10, 2022, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/17/2021) (va)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/17/2021) (vfr)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by January 10, 2022, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/17/2021) (vfr)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew G. Celli on behalf of First Look Institute, Inc., Sharon Lerner..(Celli, Andrew)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defense Threat Reduction Agency..(pc)
November 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defense Threat Reduction Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by First Look Institute, Inc., Sharon Lerner..(Greenberger, Debra)
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by First Look Institute, Inc...(Greenberger, Debra)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Greenberger, Debra)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defense Threat Reduction Agency. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25321121)Document filed by First Look Institute, Inc., Sharon Lerner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, #2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Expedited Processing Denial).(Greenberger, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Look Institute, Inc. et al v. Defense Threat Reduction Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Look Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Debra Lea Greenberger
Represented By: Andrew G. Celli
Represented By: Victoria Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Lerner
Represented By: Debra Lea Greenberger
Represented By: Andrew G. Celli
Represented By: Victoria Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Threat Reduction Agency
Represented By: Danielle Judith Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?