Auth Token LLC v. The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Plaintiff: Auth Token LLC
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv09359
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1341
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/05/2022) (ama)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Howard L. Wernow to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (JMS)
January 5, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Consent to Magistrate Form and the Joint Letter and Joint Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Howard L. Wernow dated January 5, 2022. Document filed by Auth Token LLC..(Wernow, Howard)
January 4, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation served on 12/30/2021, answer due 1/20/2022. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Operations Manager. Document filed by Auth Token LLC..(Wernow, Howard)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/24/2021) (kv)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by January 11, 2022, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/24/2021) (kv)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/24/2021) (kv)
November 24, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-09353-AT. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
November 24, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
November 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation..(jgo)
November 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
November 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 15, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 21-cv-9353. (jgo)
November 15, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Howard L. Wernow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25324355. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Howard L. Wernow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25324355. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Auth Token LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Howard L. Wernow, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Wernow, Howard)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Auth Token LLC..(Wernow, Howard)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Wernow, Howard)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Howard L. Wernow re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-09355. Document filed by Auth Token LLC..(Wernow, Howard)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wernow, Howard)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Auth Token LLC..(Wernow, Howard)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25324194)Document filed by Auth Token LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US8375212, #2 Exhibit 2-Claim Chart).(Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auth Token LLC v. The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auth Token LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?