Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv09368
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 jd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Sherri Pavloff dated January 7, 2022; granting #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Case Management Plan addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Sherri Pavloff dated January 7, 2022; granting #8 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Sherri Pavloff dated January 7, 2022. Application GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to February 4, 2022. The parties' deadline to file IPTC materials is extended to February 9, 2022, at noon. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 19, 2022, is adjourned to February 16, 2022, at 4:00 p.m. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. So Ordered. Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company answer due 2/4/2022. (Initial Conference set for 2/16/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Telephone Conference set for 2/16/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/10/2022) (mml)
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Sherri Pavloff dated January 7, 2022., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Case Management Plan addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Sherri Pavloff dated January 7, 2022., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Sherri Pavloff dated January 7, 2022. Document filed by Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company..(Pavloff, Sherri)
January 7, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Clear Blue Financial Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Pine Brook Partners II (Cayman) AV LP for Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company. Document filed by Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company..(Pavloff, Sherri)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sherri N. Pavloff on behalf of Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company..(Pavloff, Sherri)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. IPTC MATERIALS DUE: January 12, 2022 at noon. (And as further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/2/2021) (jca)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company..(jgo)
November 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Szczepanski, Lisa)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Szczepanski, Lisa)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25327116)Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Szczepanski, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Lisa Marie Szczepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Sherri N. Pavloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?