CompuSystems, Inc. v. Reed Exhibitions
Plaintiff: CompuSystems, Inc.
Defendant: Reed Exhibitions, a division of RELX, Inc. and Reed Exhibitions
Case Number: 1:2021cv09501
Filed: November 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Referring Judge: Jessica G L Clarke
2 Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2023 Filing 50 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) CompuSystems, Inc., Reed Exhibitions and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Watnick, Donald) Modified on 10/18/2023 (nd).
October 17, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Donald Watnick. RE-FILE Document No. #49 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct individual party the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (nd)
October 16, 2023 Filing 49 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Watnick, Donald) Modified on 10/17/2023 (nd).
October 3, 2023 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Reed Exhibitions..(Gibson, Michael)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #46 Status Report filed by Reed Exhibitions. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Fact Discovery due by 11/15/2023.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 9/1/2023) (mml)
August 31, 2023 Filing 46 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Reed Exhibitions..(Gibson, Michael)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment, except that any currently scheduled conference or oral argument before the Court is adjourned pending further order of the Court. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, which a https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jessica-g-l-clarke. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 8/8/2023) (tg)
August 3, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. Judge Ronnie Abrams is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
July 31, 2023 Filing 44 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Donald E. Watnick, Esq. dated July 31, 2023 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
June 30, 2023 Filing 43 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Reed Exhibitions..(Gibson, Michael)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Application GRANTED. The fact discovery deadline is extended to September 15, 2023. The expert discovery deadline is extended to October 16, 2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/1/2023) (rro)
May 1, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 10/16/2023. Fact Discovery due by 9/15/2023. (rro)
April 28, 2023 Filing 41 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Joint Status Report addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Donald E. Watnick dated April 28, 2023. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
March 31, 2023 Filing 40 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Michael H. Gibson dated March 31, 2023 re: status update to the Court regarding the progress of discovery. Document filed by Reed Exhibitions..(Gibson, Michael)
February 24, 2023 Filing 39 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Michael H. Gibson dated February 24, 2023 re: Monthly Joint Status Report. Document filed by Reed Exhibitions..(Gibson, Michael)
January 27, 2023 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Application GRANTED. The fact discovery deadline is extended to June 30, 2023. The expert discovery deadline is extended to August 31, 2023. If the parties believe that a settlement conference with the Court would be productive, they are directed to inform the Court in their monthly joint status letters. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 1/23/2023) (rro)
January 23, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 8/31/2023. Fact Discovery due by 6/30/2023. (rro)
January 20, 2023 Filing 36 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Donald E. Watnick, Esq. dated Jan. 20, 2023. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
December 28, 2022 Filing 35 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Donald E. Watnick, Esq. dated Dec. 28, 2022 re: Status Report. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
November 25, 2022 Filing 34 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Donald E. Watnick dated Nov. 25, 2022 re: Monthly Joint Status Report. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
October 31, 2022 Filing 33 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Donald E. Watnick dated Oct. 31, 2022 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
September 30, 2022 Filing 32 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Donald E. Watnick dated September 30, 2022 re: Status Report. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
July 28, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Case Management Conference held on 7/28/2022. (Quinn, Diane)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All fact discovery shall be completed by February 15, 2023. All expert discovery shall be completed by March 31, 2023. The parties are required to follow the Court's Individual Practices when seeking Court intervention on discovery disputes. See http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Wang. A joint letter informing the Court about the status of discovery shall be filed with the Court on the last Friday of every month beginning on September 30, 2022. The letter should address any outstanding discovery disputes and the efforts made by the parties to resolve these issues without Court intervention. It should also indicate whether the parties wish to schedule a settlement conference and, if so, include proposed dates on at least two consecutive weeks. The parties are, however, encouraged to contact the Court earlier if they believe a settlement conference sooner would be productive. The parties request a jury trial. Fact Discovery due by 2/15/2023. Expert Discovery due by 3/31/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/28/2022) (rro)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. The parties shall submit monthly joint status letters on the last Friday of each month, beginning on September 30, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (sfh)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for July 12, 2022, is hereby adjourned to Thursday, July 28, 2022 at 12:30 p.m. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/11/2022) Initial Conference set for 7/28/2022 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (ks)
July 8, 2022 Filing 28 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Michael H. Gibson, Esq. dated July 8, 2022. Document filed by Reed Exhibitions..(Gibson, Michael)
July 5, 2022 Filing 27 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Reed Exhibitions..(Gibson, Michael)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 6/23/2022) (rro)
June 22, 2022 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Donald Watnick dated June 22, 2022 re: Proposed Confidentiality Stipulation and Order. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Confid. Stip and Order, #2 Supplement Comparison to Model Order).(Watnick, Donald)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Tuesday, July 12, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The stay on discovery is lifted. (Initial Conference set for 7/12/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/31/2022) (rro)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a Pre-Settlement Conference Scheduling Call on Wednesday, May 25, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. The dial in information is (866) 390-1828, access code 1582687. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 5/25/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/11/2022) (tg)
May 9, 2022 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Donald E. Watnick dated May 9, 2022 re: Settlement Conference. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement); The parties have requested a settlement conference for as soon as your schedule allows. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/12/2022) (jca)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 LETTER MOTION for Discovery requesting that the Court refer the matter to Magistrate Judge Wang for the purposes of conducting a settlement conference. Application granted. The Court will refer this matter to Judge Wang by separate order. The post-discovery conference presently scheduled for July 22, 2022 is hereby adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/12/2022) (jca)
April 11, 2022 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Discovery requesting that the Court refer the matter to Magistrate Judge Wang for the purposes of conducting a settlement conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Michael H. Gibson dated 4/11/22. Document filed by Reed Exhibitions..(Gibson, Michael)
February 4, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY re: #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim . Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties have engaged in settlement discussions. This case is to be tried to a jury. Depositions shall be completed by June 30, 2022. Counsel for the parties propose the following alternative dispute resolution mechanism for this case: Referral to a Magistrate Judge for settlement discussions. Amended Pleadings due by 2/24/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 2/24/2022. Expert Deposition due by 9/15/2022. Fact Discovery due by 6/30/2022. Expert Discovery due by 9/15/2022. Discovery due by 9/30/2022. Estimate length of trial is 3-5 days.Status Conference set for 7/22/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/31/2022) (tg)
January 28, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/28/2022. (arc)
January 27, 2022 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc..(Watnick, Donald)
January 21, 2022 Filing 15 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from DONALD E. WATNICK dated January 21, 2022 re: Initial Status Conference. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
January 21, 2022 Filing 14 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
January 18, 2022 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent RELX PLC, Other Affiliate RELX Inc. for Reed Exhibitions, Reed Exhibitions. Document filed by Reed Exhibitions..(Gibson, Michael)
January 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Michael Hugh Gibson to RE-FILE Document #11 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
January 14, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against CompuSystems, Inc.. Document filed by Reed Exhibitions..(Gibson, Michael)
January 14, 2022 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Reed Exhibitions..(Gibson, Michael) Modified on 1/18/2022 (lb).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Michael H. Gibson dated 12/3/21. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Reed Exhibitions answer due 1/14/2022. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/6/2021) (va)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Michael H. Gibson dated 12/3/21. Document filed by Reed Exhibitions..(Gibson, Michael)
December 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Ignatius Coster, IV on behalf of Reed Exhibitions..(Coster, John)
December 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Hugh Gibson on behalf of Reed Exhibitions..(Gibson, Michael)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, by January 21, 2022, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: As set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by January 21, 2022, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on January 28, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. This conference will be held via telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363- 4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendant with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated.SO ORDERED. Telephone Initial Conference set for 1/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/22/2021) (ama)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Watnick, Donald)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Reed Exhibitions. (sj)
November 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Donald E. Watnick. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $2,632,209,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to (none); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
November 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Donald E. Watnick to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
November 17, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 17, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 16, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Reed Exhibitions, a division of Relx, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc...(Watnick, Donald)
November 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reed Exhibitions, a division of RELX, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25344135)Document filed by CompuSystems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Watnick, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CompuSystems, Inc. v. Reed Exhibitions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CompuSystems, Inc.
Represented By: Donald E. Watnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Exhibitions, a division of RELX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Exhibitions
Represented By: John Ignatius Coster, IV
Represented By: Michael Hugh Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?