The Travelers Indemnity Company v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv09556
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 jd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: That the time within which Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company may move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to January 24, 2022. SO ORDERED. Zurich American Insurance Company answer due 1/24/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/30/2021) (kv)
December 27, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Steven G. Adams/Noah M. Wiesner dated 12/27/2021 re: Request for Extension of Time to Answer. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer).(Adams, Steven)
December 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noah Michael Wiesner on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company..(Wiesner, Noah)
December 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Gary Adams on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company..(Adams, Steven)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER EXTENDINGTIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: That the time within which Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company, may move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to January 13, 2022. SO ORDERED. Zurich American Insurance Company answer due 1/13/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/14/2021) (jca)
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam Smith dated December 13, 2021 re: Request an extension of time to Answer the Complaint. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order - extend time to answer).(Smith, Adam)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Zurich American Insurance Company served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Reid, Meg)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/22/2021) (ks)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zurich American Insurance Company..(pc)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Reid, Meg)
November 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Reid, Meg) Modified on 11/18/2021 (lb).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zurich American Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Reid, Meg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Reid, Meg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zurich American Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25352409)Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract Agreement).(Reid, Meg)
November 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Meg R. Reid to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not all Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Indemnity Company v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Gary Adams
Represented By: Noah Michael Wiesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?