Securities and Exchange Commission v. O'Brien
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: James David O'Brien
Case Number: 1:2021cv09575
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from John M. Hanamirian, Esquire dated December 17, 2021. Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/17/2021) (vfr)
December 17, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from John M. Hanamirian, Esquire dated December 17, 2021. Document filed by James David O'Brien..(Hanamirian, John)
December 2, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Bennett Ellenbogen on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. Re: #8 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,. Service of Notice of Pretrial Conference and Individual Practices.(Ellenbogen, Bennett)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 2/17/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the conference. Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/30/2021) (vfr)
November 26, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. James David O'Brien waiver sent on 11/23/2021, answer due 1/24/2022. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Ellenbogen, Bennett)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James David O'Brien..(pc)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James David O'Brien, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Ellenbogen, Bennett)
November 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bennett Ellenbogen on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Ellenbogen, Bennett)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul G. Gizzi on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Gizzi, Paul)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Best, Richard)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James David O'Brien. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Best, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Paul G. Gizzi
Represented By: Bennett Ellenbogen
Represented By: Richard R. Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James David O'Brien
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?