MATTEL, INC. v. WWW.FISHER-PRICE.ONLINE
Case Number: 1:2021cv09608
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 28 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defaulting Defendants filed by Mattel, Inc. The motion for default judgment is GRANTED.The motion for a permanent injunction is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 28 and to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/18/2022) (ama) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: There is a pending motion for default judgment in this case. Dkt. No. 28. It is hereby ORDERED that the Court will hold a hearing to address the motion on June 24, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's tel econference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. By June 10, 2022, Plaintiff shall serve on Defendant: (1) a copy of the motion for default judgment and supporting papers; and (2) a copy of this Order setting a date and time for the default judgment hearing. By June 10, 2022, Plaintiff shall also file proof of such service on the docket. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 6/24/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/8/2022) (vfr)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. WHEREAS the Court orders that this action be unsealed, and Records Management upload all documents filed to date on the Electronic Case Filing system. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 12/06/2021)(jus)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATTEL, INC. v. WWW.FISHER-PRICE.ONLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?