Idris v. Quarantillo et al
Petitioner: Mr. Zaher Zouhair Idris and Zaher Zouhair Idris
Respondent: Director Andrea Quarantillo, Director UR MENDOZA JADDOU, Acting Director TRACY RENAUD, Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Attorney General Merrick Garland, Andrea Quarantillo, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Tracy Renaud, Alejandro Mayorkas and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 1:2021cv09746
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1421
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The application is GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 19, 2022, at 4:10 p.m., is adjourned to February 2, 2022, at 4:30 p.m. By January 26, 2022, the parties shall file a joint letter and proposed case management plan and scheduling order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 20. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 2/2/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/10/2022) (js)
January 7, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Ruth Friedman on behalf of Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Andrea Quarantillo, Tracy Renaud, Ur Mendoza Jaddou..(Friedman, Rebecca)
January 7, 2022 Filing 20 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Rebecca R. Friedman dated January 7, 2022. Document filed by Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Andrea Quarantillo, Tracy Renaud, Ur Mendoza Jaddou..(Friedman, Rebecca)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on January 19, 2022 at 4:10 p.m. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint letter on ECF January 12, 2022 at noon, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following in separate paragraphs: As set forth herein. DATE AND TIME OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: January 19, 2022 at 4:10 p.m. IPTC MATERIALS DUE: January 12, 2022 at noon.Telephonic Initial Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/01/2021) (ama)
November 23, 2021 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition (Other),,,. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Zaher Zouhair Idris..(Tseitlin, Alexandra)
November 23, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition (Other),,,. Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Zaher Zouhair Idris..(Tseitlin, Alexandra)
November 23, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition (Other),,,. Merrick Garland served on 11/23/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Zaher Zouhair Idris..(Tseitlin, Alexandra)
November 23, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition (Other),,,. Tracy Renaud served on 11/23/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Zaher Zouhair Idris..(Tseitlin, Alexandra)
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition (Other),,,. Alejandro Mayorkas served on 11/23/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Zaher Zouhair Idris..(Tseitlin, Alexandra)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition (Other),,,. Andrea Quarantillo served on 11/23/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Zaher Zouhair Idris..(Tseitlin, Alexandra)
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tracy Renaud..(gp)
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merrick Garland..(gp)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou..(gp)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrea Quarantillo..(gp)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Mayorkas..(gp)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tracy Renaud, Acting Deputy Director, USCIS, re: #1 Petition (Other),,,. Document filed by Zaher Zouhair Idris..(Tseitlin, Alexandra)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Andrea Quarantillo, Director, New York Field Office, USCIS, re: #1 Petition (Other),,,. Document filed by Zaher Zouhair Idris..(Tseitlin, Alexandra)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, DHS, re: #1 Petition (Other),,,. Document filed by Zaher Zouhair Idris..(Tseitlin, Alexandra)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Director, USCIS, re: #1 Petition (Other),,,. Document filed by Zaher Zouhair Idris..(Tseitlin, Alexandra)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrick Garland, Attorney General, re: #1 Petition (Other),,,. Document filed by Zaher Zouhair Idris..(Tseitlin, Alexandra)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tseitlin, Alexandra)
November 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alexandra Vera Tseitlin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Andrea Quarantillo, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TRACY RENAUD, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (vf)
November 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Alexandra Vera Tseitlin. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
November 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexandra Vera Tseitlin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Queens; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
November 23, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 23, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 23, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW OF DENIAL OF APPLICATION FOR NATURALIZATION, 8 U.S.C 1421 AND REQUEST FOR DE NOVO HEARING. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25370853).Document filed by Zaher Zouhair Idris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marriage Certificate, #2 Exhibit Interview Notice, #3 Exhibit Approved Applications I-130 and I-485, #4 Exhibit NTA, #5 Exhibit Motion to Terminate, #6 Exhibit IJ's Order, #7 Exhibit Green Card, #8 Exhibit N-400 Application and Receipt, #9 Exhibit Interview Results and Decision to Deny N-400, #10 Exhibit I-485 Application 2001, #11 Exhibit Signed Pages, #12 Exhibit N-336 Application, Interview Notice and Brief, #13 Exhibit Certificates of Disposition).(Tseitlin, Alexandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Idris v. Quarantillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. Zaher Zouhair Idris
Represented By: Alexandra Vera Tseitlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zaher Zouhair Idris
Represented By: Alexandra Vera Tseitlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Andrea Quarantillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director UR MENDOZA JADDOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Director TRACY RENAUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrea Quarantillo
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?