Tavarez-Vargas v. Made By Haven, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carmen Tavarez-Vargas
Defendant: Made By Haven, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv09915
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on February 15, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts, as further set forth. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to notify all counsel of this Notice. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. Initial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 1/4/2022) (mml)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Karla Del Pozo Garcia dated December 30, 2021.. All Defendants (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
December 30, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Karla Del Pozo Garcia dated December 30, 2021. Document filed by Made By Haven, Inc...(Del Pozo Garcia, Karla)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karla Del Pozo Garcia on behalf of Made By Haven, Inc...(Del Pozo Garcia, Karla)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Made By Haven, Inc. served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. Service was accepted by Lisa Rhodes, Agent. Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward)
November 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward Y. Kroub. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx. (vf)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Made By Haven, Inc...(gp)
November 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
November 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
November 29, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Made By Haven, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Made By Haven, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25380471)Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tavarez-Vargas v. Made By Haven, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Tavarez-Vargas
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Made By Haven, Inc.
Represented By: Karla Del Pozo Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?