Tavarez-Vargas v. WeVideo, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carmen Tavarez-Vargas
Defendant: WeVideo, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10024
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/31/2021) (ama)
December 31, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: WeVideo, Inc. answer due 2/3/2022. (ama)
December 30, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint from January 4, 2022 to February 3, 2022 addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Eric G. Hoffman dated December 30, 2021. Document filed by WeVideo, Inc...(Hoffman, Eric)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric G. Hoffman on behalf of WeVideo, Inc...(Hoffman, Eric)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. WeVideo, Inc. served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. Service was accepted by Legal Representative, Agent. Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward)
November 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward Y. Kroub. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx. (sj)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to WeVideo, Inc...(sj)
November 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 29, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WeVideo, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WeVideo, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25384374)Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tavarez-Vargas v. WeVideo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Tavarez-Vargas
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WeVideo, Inc.
Represented By: Eric G. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?