Girotto v. Morgane Le Fay Soho LLC et al
Plaintiff: Luigi Girotto
Defendant: Morgane Le Fay Soho LLC a New York limited liability company doing business as Morgane Le Fay and 150 Greene Street Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10107
Filed: November 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 150 Greene Street Corp...(pc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morgane Le Fay Soho LLC..(pc)
December 24, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 150 GREENE STREET CORP., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Luigi Girotto..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
December 24, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MORGANE LE FAY SOHO LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Luigi Girotto..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/30/2021) (vfr)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/30/2021) (jca)
November 30, 2021 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only..(wb)
November 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
November 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
November 29, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
November 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 150 Greene Street Corp., Morgane Le Fay Soho LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25387220)Document filed by Luigi Girotto..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Girotto v. Morgane Le Fay Soho LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luigi Girotto
Represented By: Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgane Le Fay Soho LLC a New York limited liability company doing business as Morgane Le Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 150 Greene Street Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?