SingularDTV GmbH v. LeBeau et al
Plaintiff: SingularDTV GmbH
Defendant: Zachary James LeBeau, Kimberly Jackson and Zachary LeBeau
Case Number: 1:2021cv10130
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 co
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CONSENT ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, the Parties have AGREED and the Court ORDERS as follows: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall transfer 12,000.415454144426866188 ETH held on a cold wallet hardware device ("Cold Wallet") to an escrow arrangement as separately agreed upon by the Parties; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall deliver physical possession of the device storing the Cold Wallet, together with all charging devices and authorizations including log-in information and passwords, to an escrow arrangement as separately agreed upon by the Parties; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall cause a full and complete migration of all singulardtv.com and breaker.io e-mail accounts for current and former SingularDTV employees and contractors identified by the Parties over which Defendants have possession and control to a separate third-party contractor of SingularDTV's choice by no later than February 1, 2022; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall not take any actions on behalf of themselves or SingularDTV LLC (d/b/a "Breaker LLC") with respect to SingularDTV's Intellectual Property Rights, as defined in a January 5, 2017 Amended Service and Development Agreement entered between SingularDTV and Breaker LLC, without SingularDTV's prior written approval; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, the TRO, as amended, shall remain in effect until the above-referenced transfers of the ETH, Cold Wallet, and e-mail accounts, as ordered above, are effectuated; provided that the TRO permits such transfers and migration; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, immediately upon Defendants' transfer of the referenced ETH, Cold Wallet, and e-mail accounts, as ordered above, the TRO, as amended, shall be dissolved and no longer in effect. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/25/2022) (tg)
January 24, 2022 Filing 65 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Parties dated January 24th, 2022 re: Resolution of Preliminary Injunction Motion and Proposed Consent Order. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Attachment).(Sauter, Benjamin)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing currently scheduled for Tuesday, January 25, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. is canceled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than January 28, 2022, the parties must inform the Court via joint letter whether Plaintiff is seeking any additional relief or whether the case has settled in toto. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/24/2022) (tg)
January 3, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/9/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
January 3, 2022 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/9/2021 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/24/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to submit courtesy copies of their exhibits to the Court electronically is adjourned from noon, January 3, 2022 until noon, January 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/31/2021) (tg)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CONSENT ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Hearing scheduled on January 5, 2022 is adjourned until [January 25, 2022, at 10:00 a.m.]; IT IS ORDERED that the TRO, as amended, is extended on agreement by the Parties until [January 25, 2022, at 10:00 a.m.]. ( Show Cause Hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/30/2021) (tg)
December 30, 2021 Filing 59 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Parties dated December 30th, 2021 re: January 5th, 2022 Hearing. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Sauter, Benjamin)
December 29, 2021 Filing 58 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Neil L. Postrygacz dated 12/27/2021 re: witness list. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(Postrygacz, Neil)
December 29, 2021 Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Benjamin J. A. Sauter dated December 29th, 2021 re: Witness List for Hearing Scheduled for January 5, 2022. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)
December 27, 2021 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Neil L. Postrygacz in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected].. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit).(Postrygacz, Neil)
December 16, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 12/1/2021 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
December 16, 2021 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 12/1/2021 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Franko, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
December 10, 2021 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Patrik Allenspach in Support re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected].. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 14, #3 Exhibit 15, #4 Exhibit 16, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 19, #8 Exhibit 20, #9 Exhibit 21, #10 Exhibit 22, #11 Exhibit 23, #12 Exhibit 24, #13 Exhibit 25, #14 Exhibit 26, #15 Exhibit 27, #16 Exhibit 28, #17 Exhibit 29, #18 Exhibit 30, #19 Exhibit 31, #20 Exhibit 32).(Sauter, Benjamin)
December 10, 2021 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Kevin E. Madura in Support re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected].. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3).(Sauter, Benjamin)
December 10, 2021 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Michael Mraz in Support re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected].. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)
December 10, 2021 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Benjamin J. A. Sauter in Support re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected].. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6).(Sauter, Benjamin)
December 10, 2021 Filing 49 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected]. . Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the preliminary injunction hearing currently scheduled for Tuesday, December 14, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. is ADJOURNED until Wednesday, January 5, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. The parties should note that this is a different date and time than that stated on the record during the December 9, 2021 teleconference, in which the Court indicated that the hearing would take place on Tuesday, January 4, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. The Court realized after the telephone conference that it has a conflicting hearing that day that cannot be changed and apologizes for any inconvenience the change in date and time causes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's two Switzerland-based witnesses, Mr. Patrik Allenspach and Mr. Michael Mraz, may testify via video. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must still reply to Defendants' briefing in opposition to the motion for a preliminary injunction by December 10, 2021. In light of the adjourned date for the hearing, Defendants may supplement or substitute their briefing in opposition not later than December 27, 2021. Defendants are cautioned that the Court is NOT authorizing the submission of a surreply. Plaintiff may reply to any additional or substituted briefing by the Defendants not later than January 3, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must submit witness lists to the Court, including the anticipated length of direct testimony, not later than December 29, 2021. Courtesy copies of any exhibits either party intends to introduce must be provided to the Court electronically to CaproniNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov not later than noon, January 3, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the existing Temporary Restraining Order, as amended, is extended until January 5, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 12/27/2021, Replies due by 1/3/2022., Show Cause Hearing set for 1/5/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/9/2021) (tg)
December 9, 2021 Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Neil L. Postrygacz dated December 9, 2021 re: remote testimony request. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(Postrygacz, Neil)
December 9, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Telephone Conference held on 12/9/2021. Attorney Benjamin Sauter present for the plaintiff. Attorney Neil Postrygacz present for the defendants. Court Reporter Kristen Carannante present. (anc)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #43 Letter filed by SingularDTV GmbH. ENDORSEMENT: The parties must appear for a teleconference to address the testimony dispute on Thursday, December 9, 2021, at 11:30 a.m. The parties may dial-in at (888) 363-4749 // Access Code 3121171# // Security Code 1013#. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 12/9/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/8/2021) (tg)
December 8, 2021 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Edward Greenwood in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected].. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(Postrygacz, Neil)
December 8, 2021 Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Neil L. Postrygacz dated December 8, 2021 re: response to Plaintif's letter. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(Postrygacz, Neil)
December 8, 2021 Filing 43 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Benjamin J. A. Sauter dated December 8th, 2021 re: In Response to Dkt. No. 41. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)
December 8, 2021 Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Benjamin J. A. Sauter dated December 8th, 2021 re: In Response to Dkt. No. 41. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)
December 8, 2021 Filing 41 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Neil L. Postrygacz dated 12/08/21 re: Plaintiff's letter. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(Postrygacz, Neil)
December 8, 2021 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Niklaus Glatthard in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected].. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POA, #2 Exhibit Resignation, #3 Exhibit Executed Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit Bylaws, #5 Exhibit Chart, #6 Exhibit statement and counter statement, #7 Exhibit authorization order).(Postrygacz, Neil)
December 7, 2021 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected]. CORRECTED. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(Postrygacz, Neil)
December 7, 2021 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected]. . Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(Postrygacz, Neil)
December 7, 2021 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Zachary LeBeau in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected].. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Derivative Complaint, #2 Exhibit ConsenSys Invoices, #3 Exhibit Minutes, #4 Exhibit Reddit Post, #5 Exhibit Services agreement and termination, #6 Exhibit May 2021 resolution, #7 Exhibit June 2021 resolution).(Postrygacz, Neil)
December 7, 2021 Filing 36 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #35 Letter filed by SingularDTV GmbH. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants must respond to Plaintiff's request not later than 2:00 p.m. on December 8, 2021. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/7/2021) (ate)
December 7, 2021 Filing 35 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Benjamin J. A. Sauter dated December 7th, 2021 re: In Response to Order Dkt. No. 21. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)
December 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #33 Letter response to Plaintiffs letter docket number 31 filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau. ENDORSEMENT : Application DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/5/21) (yv)
December 3, 2021 Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from neil l. postrygacz dated 12/03/21 re: response to Plaintiffs letter docket number 31. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit emails).(Postrygacz, Neil)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #31 Letter filed by SingularDTV GmbH. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' request to adjourn the briefing deadlines and hearing is DENIED. Not later than 9:00 a.m. on Saturday, December 4, 2021, Defendants must provide Plaintiff the name of the New York Breaker employee who must continue to retain access to one large overhaul account by both the Breaker and SingularDTV GmbH email accounts. If Defendants are not in compliance with the TRO relative to email access by 6:00 p.m. on Saturday, December 4, 2021, Plaintiff is entitled to expedited discovery on that issue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/3/2021) (tg)
December 3, 2021 Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Benjamin J. A. Sauter dated December 3rd, 2021 re: In Response to Dkt. No. 30. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #29 Letter filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff is ordered to inform the Court by end of business today, December 3, 2021, whether it consents to Defendants' request. The soonest the Court would be able to hold the preliminary injunction hearing, other than the currently scheduled date, would be January 3, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/3/2021) (tg)
December 3, 2021 Filing 29 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Neil L. Postrygacz dated 12/03/2021 re: extension and adjournment request. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(Postrygacz, Neil)
December 3, 2021 Filing 28 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni dated December 3rd, 2021 re: In Response to Order Dkt. No. 25. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)
December 2, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexa Perlman on behalf of SingularDTV GmbH..(Perlman, Alexa)
December 2, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Cogburn on behalf of SingularDTV GmbH..(Cogburn, Christopher)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER MODIFYING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants must immediately provide, or cause to be provided, to Patrik Allenspach full and unrestricted administrative access to and control over e- mail accounts (meaning, by way of example, inboxes, sent e-mails and all other e-mail folders, folder structures, calendars or calendar entries, task lists, and/or all associated attachments and files (all together, an individual's "E-mail Account")) used by the following persons: Patrik Allenspach (Resident Signatory for SingularDTV GmbH) Arie Levy Cohen (former Chief Financial Officer to SingularDTV GmbH) Iwona Popieluch / Iwona Schwartz (former Chief Financial Officer to SingularDTV GmbH) Martin Trepp (former Chief Financial Officer to SingularDTV GmbH) Joseph Lubin (Chief Technology Officer to SingularDTV GmbH) Amrita Rizal (former compliance officer to SingularDTV GmbH) Victoria Maksheeva (former compliance officer to SingularDTV GmbH) Alicja Popieluch / Alicja Gniady (former accountant to SingularDTV GmbH) Simon Walti (former legal counsel to SingularDTV GmbH) Elanie Marais (former head of Human Resources to SingularDTV GmbH) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall not access nor cause nor permit others to access the email accounts belonging to Singular DTV GmbH, its employees, contractors, and former employees listed above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must submit a joint letter on ECF not later than 9:00 a.m., December 3, 2021, confirming that the required email access has been restored. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the terms of the December 1, 2021, TRO, see Dkt. 21, remain in effect. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/2/2021) (tg)
December 2, 2021 Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Neil L. Postrygacz dated 12/02/2021 re: proposed language for TRO. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(Postrygacz, Neil)
December 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Neil Postrygacz to RE-FILE Document No. #22 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Please add So Ordered to the bottom of the document, along with the Judge's name and a signature line for the Judge to sign. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Order found under the event list Proposed Orders. (km)
December 1, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Status Conference held on 12/1/2021. Attorney Benjamin Sauter present for the plaintiff. Attorney Neil Postrygacz present for the defendant. Court Reporter Lisa Franko present. (anc)
December 1, 2021 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Benjamin J. A. Sauter dated December 1st, 2021 re: In Response to Order Dkt. No. 21. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)
December 1, 2021 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(Postrygacz, Neil) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 12/2/2021 (km).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, for the reasons stated on the record at the December 1, 2021, hearing, Plaintiff's motion for a TRO is GRANTED in part. Defendants are hereby temporarily restrained from taking any step, whether by their personal actions or by causing another to act, to transfer, conceal, encumber, dissipate, or otherwise impair the value of any assets in their possession or control that are the property of the Plaintiff, including but not limited to the Cold Wallet, the digital assets stored on the Cold Wallet, the private keys associated with those digital assets, any and all proceeds thereof. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer regarding appropriate language for the Court to include in a modified TRO that would address restoring Plaintiff, its employees and contractors' access to their email accounts or addresses. Mutually agreeable language must be submitted to the Court via ECF by 7:30 p.m. on December 1, 2021. If the parties cannot agree on proposed language, they must separately submit proposed language by 8:00 p.m. on December 1, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' are ordered to show cause why Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction should not be granted; responsive papers are due not later than December 7, 2021. Plaintiff's reply is due not later than December 10, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must appear for a hearing on the preliminary injunction motion on Tuesday, December 14, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. SO ORDERED. (Show Cause Hearing set for 12/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Show Cause Response due by 12/7/2021. ) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/1/2021) (anc)
December 1, 2021 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Neil L. Postrygacz in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected].. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(Postrygacz, Neil)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties must appear for a conference on whether the Court should grant the TRO and to set a briefing schedule for the Preliminary Injunction on Wednesday, December 1, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 443, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants may file a response to Plaintiff's motion not later than 11:00 a.m. on Wednesday, December 1, 2021. The response should address only whether the Court should issue a TRO and, if the Court does issue a TRO, the amount of an appropriate bond. ( Responses due by 12/1/2021), ( Status Conference set for 12/1/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/30/2021) (ate)
November 30, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Michael Mraz re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9).(Sauter, Benjamin)
November 30, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Patrik Allenspach re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12).(Sauter, Benjamin)
November 30, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Benjamin J. A. Sauter re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Sauter, Benjamin)
November 30, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Neil L. Postrygacz dated November 30, 2021 re: REQUEST TRO CONFERENCE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Document filed by Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(Postrygacz, Neil)
November 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neil Leon Postrygacz on behalf of Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(Postrygacz, Neil)
November 30, 2021 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected]. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin) Modified on 11/30/2021 (lb).
November 30, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kimberly Jackson, Zachary LeBeau..(jgo)
November 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Benjamin Jeffrey Aaron Sauter. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Zachary James LeBeau. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
November 30, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
November 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Benjamin Jeffrey Aaron Sauter. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (jgo)
November 30, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
November 30, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 30, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Valerie E. Caproni as possibly related to 21-cv-6000. (jgo)
November 30, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-06000-VEC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
November 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
November 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
November 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Benjamin Jeffrey Aaron Sauter to RE-FILE Document #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law) [Corrected].. Use the event type Memorandum of Law (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (lb)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LINKED TO A DEFICIENT ENTRY DECLARATION of Michael Mraz in Support re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law).. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9).(Sauter, Benjamin) Modified on 11/30/2021 (lb).
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LINKED TO A DEFICIENT ENTRY DECLARATION of Patrik Allenspach in Support re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law).. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12).(Sauter, Benjamin) Modified on 11/30/2021 (lb).
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LINKED TO A DEFICIENT ENTRY DECLARATION of Benjamin J. A. Sauter in Support re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law).. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Sauter, Benjamin) Modified on 11/30/2021 (lb).
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause (Memorandum of Law). Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin) Modified on 11/30/2021 (lb).
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zachary LeBeau, Kimberly Jackson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-06000-VEC. Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sauter, Benjamin)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kimberly Jackson, Zachary James LeBeau. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25395627)Document filed by SingularDTV GmbH..(Sauter, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SingularDTV GmbH v. LeBeau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SingularDTV GmbH
Represented By: Benjamin Jeffrey Aaron Sauter
Represented By: Alexa Perlman
Represented By: Christopher Cogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary James LeBeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Jackson
Represented By: Neil Leon Postrygacz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary LeBeau
Represented By: Neil Leon Postrygacz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?