Czernyk v. Bongiovanni
Plaintiff: Julianna Czernyk
Counter Claimant: Michael Bongiovanni
Case Number: 1:2021cv10429
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Motion for Special Hearing re: #17 MOTION for Special Hearing and Interim Relief. For the reasons given at the conference held today, the defendant's motion for a special hearing and interim relief (ECF No. 17) is denied without prejudice. The defendant may make a renewed motion without a pre-motion conference. The briefing schedule with respect to any renewed motion will be governed by Local Civil Rule 6.1. The plaintiff must move or answer with respect to the defendant's counterclaim by February 18, 2022. If the plaintiff files a motion to dismiss, any opposition is due by March 7, 2022. Any reply is due by March 18, 2022. No pre-motion conference is necessary. The parties are directed to submit a Rule 26(f) report by March 28, 2022. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 17. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/1/2022) (mml)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 2/18/2022. Responses due by 3/7/2022 Replies due by 3/18/2022. (mml)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: re: #14 MOTION to Seal Exhibit E to Declaration of Priya Chaudhry in Support of Defendant's Motion for Expedited Hearing and Interim Relief filed by Michael Bongiovanni. The defendant's application to seal Exhibit E to the declaration of Priya Chaudhry (ECF No. 18-5) is denied. The Court will hold a conference on February 1, 2022, at 4:00 p.m. The parties may access the conference using the following dial-in: 888-363-4749, with access code 8140049. The Clerk is directed to lift any seal on this case and to close Docket No. 14. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 2/1/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/31/2022) (ama)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #16 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION for Special Hearing and Interim Relief. . Document filed by Michael Bongiovanni, Julianna Czernyk. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #14 .(Chaudhry, Priya)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Priya Chaudhry in Support re: #17 MOTION for Special Hearing and Interim Relief.. Document filed by Michael Bongiovanni, Julianna Czernyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Outcome Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Appeal Outcome Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Defamation Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Email Exchange, #5 Exhibit E - Crumiller Blog, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Instagram Story, #7 Exhibit G - Crumiller Tweet, #8 Exhibit H - Goldberg Tweet)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #14 .(Chaudhry, Priya)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION for Special Hearing and Interim Relief. Document filed by Michael Bongiovanni, Julianna Czernyk.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #14 .(Chaudhry, Priya)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Michael Bongiovanni. Related Document Number: [14, 15]..(Chaudhry, Priya) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 MOTION to Seal Exhibit E to Declaration of Priya Chaudhry in Support of Defendant's Motion for Expedited Hearing and Interim Relief. . Document filed by Michael Bongiovanni..(Chaudhry, Priya)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Seal Exhibit E to Declaration of Priya Chaudhry in Support of Defendant's Motion for Expedited Hearing and Interim Relief. Document filed by Michael Bongiovanni..(Chaudhry, Priya)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Julianna Czernyk. Document filed by Michael Bongiovanni..(Chaudhry, Priya)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF THE THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties, that no party hereto is an infant or incompetent, and Plaintiff agrees to dismiss the Third Cause of Action (Intentional Infliction of Emotion Distress) of Plaintiff's Verified Amended Complaint dated November 5, 2021, with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. PURSUANT TO THIS STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/5/2022) (mml)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Michael Bongiovanni..(Zuckerman, Seth)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Karolena Crumiller on behalf of Julianna Czernyk..(Crumiller, Susan)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hilary Joy Orzick on behalf of Julianna Czernyk..(Orzick, Hilary)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties, that the time within which Defendant Michael Bongiovanni may move, answer or otherwise respond to the Verified Amended Complaint is hereby extended up to and including January 28, 2022. This Stipulation is without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to seek remand. PURSUANT TO THIS STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED. Michael Bongiovanni answer due 1/28/2022. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/13/2021) (jca)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Michael Bongiovanni..(Zuckerman, Seth)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shaelyn Gambino-Morrison on behalf of Michael Bongiovanni..(Gambino-Morrison, Shaelyn)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Priya Chaudhry on behalf of Michael Bongiovanni..(Chaudhry, Priya)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth Jason Zuckerman on behalf of Michael Bongiovanni..(Zuckerman, Seth)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zuckerman, Seth)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 814444/2021E..Document filed by Michael Bongiovanni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Verified Amended Complaint).(Zuckerman, Seth)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Seth Jason Zuckerman. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Seth Jason Zuckerman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3, Notice of Removal exhibits must be filed as attachments and labeled. Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc.". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY TITLED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 814444/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25433449).Document filed by Michael Bongiovanni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Zuckerman, Seth) Modified on 12/8/2021 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Czernyk v. Bongiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianna Czernyk
Represented By: Susan Karolena Crumiller
Represented By: Hilary Joy Orzick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Michael Bongiovanni
Represented By: Seth Jason Zuckerman
Represented By: Priya Chaudhry
Represented By: Shaelyn Gambino-Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?