Jane Doe v. University of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: University of Chicago, University of Chicago Medical Center, Saul Levmore, Thomas Miles, Michele Richardson, Michael Schill, Abbie Willard and David Zarfes
Case Number: 1:2021cv10487
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Re-mailed a copy of #3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application to Jane Doe at Grace Station, 229 E. 85th Street, P.O. Box 117, New York, NY 10028. (kh)
January 20, 2022 Filing 5 PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 1/20/22 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Jane Doe. New Address: Grace Station, 229 E. 85th Street, P.O. Box 117, New York, New York, 10028. (sc)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE MEMORANDUM, dated 1/18/22 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Jane Doe. New Address: P.O. Box 13, Captain Cook, HI, 96704. (sc)
December 21, 2021 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application to Jane Doe at 78-7006 Walua Rd, Kailua Kona, HI 96740. (kh)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the fees or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962).Fees due by 1/19/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 1/19/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on December 20, 2021) (Attachments: #1 IFP application) (jjg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 20, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Saul Levmore, Thomas Miles, Michele Richardson, Michael Schill, University of Chicago, University of Chicago Medical Center, Abbie Willard, David Zarfes. Document filed by Jane Doe..(rdz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2021: #1 Main Document, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (rdz). Modified on 12/9/2021 (rdz).
December 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Doe v. University of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Chicago Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Levmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbie Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Zarfes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?