Labossiere v. Downstate Correctional Facility et al
Plaintiff: Wilfred Labossiere
Defendant: Downstate Correctional Facility, C.O. Akinwunmi and C.O. A. Jones
Case Number: 1:2021cv10540
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/27/2022) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 27, 2022 Mailed a copy of #7 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Warden/Superintendent of Sing Sing Correctional Facility, 354 Hunter Street, Ossining, NY 10562. (dsh)
January 20, 2022 Filing 6 Original Signature Received from Wilfred Labossiere re: #1 IFP Application. (sc)
January 6, 2022 Re-mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Original Signature to Wilfred Labossiere, 14-A-2683 at Sing Sing Correctional Facility, 354 Hunter Street, Ossining, NY 10562. (kh) Modified on 1/6/2022 (kh).
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER from W. Labossiere, dated 12/22/21 re: I am writing to update my address on several suits filed in the U.S. District Court- Southern District of New York. The address change is Wilfred Labossiere, DIN#14A2683, Sing Sing Corr. Facility, 354 Hunter Street, Ossining, NY 10562. Document filed by Wilfred Labossiere.(sc)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE: Plaintiff is directed to submit a signed signature page to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Signature Page due by 1/14/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/15/2021) (Attachments: #1 Supplement IFP signature page) (scn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 15, 2021 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Original Signature to Wilfred Labossiere, 14-A-2683 at Downstate Correctional Facility, 121 Red School House RD, Fishkill, NY 12524. (kh)
December 15, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Wilfred Labossiere..(rdz)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Akinwunmi, Downstate Correctional Facility, A. Jones. Document filed by Wilfred Labossiere..(rdz)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Wilfred Labossiere..(rdz)
December 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labossiere v. Downstate Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfred Labossiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downstate Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Akinwunmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?