Wiley v. Paysafe Limited et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Wiley
Defendant: Paysafe Limited, Foley Trasimene Acquisition Corp. II, Richard N. Massey, Bryan D. Coy, Philip McHugh and Ismail (Izzy) Dawood
Case Number: 1:2021cv10611
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Referring Judge: Katharine H Parker
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #13 Letter filed by Lisa Wiley. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. The Case Management Conference is hereby rescheduled for May 5, 2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 5/5/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/13/2022) (vfr)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff and the undersigned counsel for Defendants that: 1. The undersigned counsel for Defendants hereby accept service of Plaintiff's Complaint in this action and certify that they are authorized to do so; 2. By entering into this Stipulation, Plaintiff agrees that Defendants neither submit to the jurisdiction of this Court nor waive any defense, including lack of personal jurisdiction. Defendants waive only defenses based on insufficient process and insufficient service of process. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/12/22) (yv)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Gregory B. Linkh, Craig S. Waldman, and John A. Neuwirth dated January 12, 2022 re: Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Lisa Wiley..(Linkh, Gregory)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Lisa Wiley..(Linkh, Gregory)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Dawson on behalf of Ismail (Izzy) Dawood, Philip McHugh, Paysafe Limited..(Dawson, Amy)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Scott Waldman on behalf of Ismail (Izzy) Dawood, Philip McHugh, Paysafe Limited..(Waldman, Craig)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan K. Youngwood on behalf of Ismail (Izzy) Dawood, Philip McHugh, Paysafe Limited..(Youngwood, Jonathan)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evert John Christensen on behalf of Bryan D. Coy, Richard N. Massey..(Christensen, Evert)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John A. Neuwirth on behalf of Bryan D. Coy, Richard N. Massey..(Neuwirth, John)
December 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/15/2022 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/18/2021) (vfr)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/17/2021) (ama)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bryan D. Coy, Ismail (Izzy) Dawood, Richard N. Massey, Philip McHugh, Paysafe Limited..(jgo)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PAYSAFE LIMITED f/k/a FOLEY TRASIMENE ACQUISITION CORP. II, RICHARD N. MASSEY, BRYAN D. COY, PHILIP MCHUGH, and ISMAIL (IZZY) DAWOOD, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lisa Wiley..(Linkh, Gregory)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linkh, Gregory)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryan D. Coy, Ismail (Izzy) Dawood, Richard N. Massey, Philip McHugh, Paysafe Limited. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25455130)Document filed by Lisa Wiley..(Linkh, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiley v. Paysafe Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paysafe Limited
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Amy Dawson
Represented By: Craig Scott Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foley Trasimene Acquisition Corp. II
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Amy Dawson
Represented By: Craig Scott Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard N. Massey
Represented By: Evert John Christensen
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan D. Coy
Represented By: Evert John Christensen
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip McHugh
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Amy Dawson
Represented By: Craig Scott Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismail (Izzy) Dawood
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Amy Dawson
Represented By: Craig Scott Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Wiley
Represented By: Gregory Bradley Linkh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?