Holmes v. City of New York
Plaintiff: Stanley Holmes
Defendant: City of New York
Case Number: 1:2021cv10628
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO AMEND: Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Courts Pro Se Intake Unit within 60 days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 21-CV-10628 (LTS). An Amended Civil Rights Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/10/22) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 10, 2022 Mailed a copy of #8 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to Stanley Holmes, DIN: 16A2942 at Great Meadow Correctional Facility, 11739 State Route 22, P.O. Box 51, Comstock, NY 12821-0051. (dsh)
January 6, 2022 Mailed a copy of #7 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case to Great Meadow Correctional Facility at 11739 State Route 22, P.O. Box 51, Comstock, NY 12821-0051. (kh)
January 5, 2022 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Judge Swain's Individual rules; Motions Guide to Stanley Holmes DIN: 16A2942 Great Meadow Correctional Facility 11739 State Route 22 P.O. Box 51 Comstock, NY 12821-0051 on 1/5/2022. (aan)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/4/2022) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Stanley Holmes.(sc)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER from S. Holmes, dated 12/27/21 re: I have done what was requested in the memo which was sent to me. I have from 1/29/22 to 11/1/22. Also, please send me a proper booklet on how to argue a pro-se issue or issues etc. Document filed by Stanley Holmes.(sc) Modified on 1/6/2022 (sc).
January 3, 2022 Request for Copy of Pro Se instructions Received: Re #6 Letter,. Request for copy of Pro Se instructions on how to argue issues pro se from S. Holmes received on 1/3/22. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
December 14, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING UPDATED PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 1/12/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/13/2021) (Attachments: #1 prisoner authorization) (keb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 13, 2021 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Updated Prisoner Authorization, to Stanley Holmes, DIN: 16A2942 at Great Meadow Correctional Facility, 11739 State Route 22, P.O. Box 51, Comstock, NY 12821-0051. (Attachments: # 1 prisoner authorization) (dsh)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Stanley Holmes. (sac)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against City of New York. Document filed by Stanley Holmes. (sac)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Stanley Holmes. (sac)
December 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?