Senior v. ViacomCBS Inc.
Plaintiff: Patricia Senior
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10640
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #13 Letter filed by Patricia Senior. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks counsel for this clarification. The Court will consider service to have been effected January 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/25/2022) (ama)
January 25, 2022 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from John Beranbaum dated January 25, 2022 re: Substitution of Attorney and Affidavit of Service. Document filed by Patricia Senior..(Beranbaum, John)
January 25, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Crumiller P.C., Susan K. Crumiller, New Attorney: John A. Beranbaum, Address: Reavis Page Jump LLP, 41 Madison Avenue, 41st Floor, New York, New York, United States 10010, 212-763-4100. Document filed by Patricia Senior..(Beranbaum, John)
January 25, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. ViacomCBS Inc. served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Business Document Specialist. Document filed by Patricia Senior..(Beranbaum, John)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc.. Document filed by ViacomCBS Inc...(Coyne, Michele)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Michele A. Coyne dated 01/03/2022. Granted. SO ORDERED. ViacomCBS Inc. answer due 1/26/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/4/2022) (va)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Michele A. Coyne dated 01/03/2022. Document filed by ViacomCBS Inc...(Coyne, Michele)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Budow on behalf of ViacomCBS Inc...(Budow, Scott)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michele Ann Coyne on behalf of ViacomCBS Inc...(Coyne, Michele)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Patricia Senior served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. Service was accepted by Theodore M.. Document filed by Patricia Senior..(Beranbaum, John)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ViacomCBS Inc...(sj)
December 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John A. Beranbaum. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:0451; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:2000(e); the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
December 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
December 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
December 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Beranbaum, John)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ViacomCBS Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Patricia Senior..(Beranbaum, John)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Patricia Senior. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25460840)Document filed by Patricia Senior..(Beranbaum, John) Modified on 12/14/2021 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Senior v. ViacomCBS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Senior
Represented By: John A. Beranbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Michele Ann Coyne
Represented By: Scott Budow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?