Bionpharma Inc. v. Corerx, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bionpharma Inc.
Defendant: Corerx, Inc.
Intervenor: Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10656
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION to Withdraw with respect to that aspect of Azurity's motion seeking reconsideration of the preliminary injunction, and instead respectfully moves only for intervention and for the Court to order that the record on the preliminary injunction be supplemented to include the material previously submitted with Azurity's motion. Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Richlin, Eli)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER with respect to #82 Letter Motion to Stay re: #82 MOTION to Stay [Notice of Emergency Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal and to Set Security]. The plaintiff should respond to the defendant's motion to stay, ECF No. 82, by February 11, 2022. The defendant should reply by February 15, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/8/2022) (va)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/11/2022. Replies due by 2/15/2022. (va)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 DECLARATION of Ajay Damani in Support re: #82 MOTION to Stay [Notice of Emergency Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal and to Set Security].. Document filed by Corerx, Inc...(Russ, Peter)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REDACTION to #83 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, by Corerx, Inc..(Russ, Peter)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #82 MOTION to Stay [Notice of Emergency Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal and to Set Security]. . Document filed by Corerx, Inc., Bionpharma Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #21 .(Russ, Peter)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Stay [Notice of Emergency Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal and to Set Security]. Document filed by Corerx, Inc...(Russ, Peter)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: As discussed during today's conference, the plaintiff's response to Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s motion to intervene and for reconsideration, ECF No. 66, is due on February 11, 2022. The plaintiff's response to Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s motion to seal, ECF No. 63, is also due on February 11, 2022. Replies are due on February 15, 2022. The Clerk of Court is requested to close Letter Motion No. 76 to expedite the briefing schedule. So Ordered. (Responses due by 2/11/2022, Replies due by 2/15/2022.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/4/2022) (js)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: The Court has signed the proposed preliminary injunction proposed by Bionpharma. The additional conditions proposed by CoreRx, Inc. exceed the terms of the preliminary injunction ordered by the Court. To the extent that there are disputes concerning prices, delivery dates, or the scope of the indemnification provided for in the Agreement, the parties should comply with the Agreement, as provided for in the proposed preliminary injunction. To the extent that there are any further disputes, the parties should follow the dispute resolution procedures contained in the Agreement in the first instance. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/4/2022) (ks)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Bionpharma Inc.'s motion for a preliminary injunction shall be and hereby is GRANTED as follows: 1. Defendant CoreRx, Inc. ("CoreRx"), its officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and other persons who are in active concert or participation with them who have actual notice of this preliminary injunction by personal service or otherwise are hereby ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED from failing to have CoreRx fill the orders for enalapril maleate oral solution ("Product") placed by plaintiff Bionpharma Inc. ("Bionpharma") under the parties' Master Manufacturing Supply Agreement (the "Agreement") in purchase order 4500001497 and purchase order 4500001835, as more specifically set forth in paragraphs 2 and 3 below. 2. CoreRx shall fill the balance of purchase order 4500001497, amounting to 12,459 bottles of Product, according to the terms therein_by no later than March 4, 2022. 3. CoreRx shall fill purchase order 4500001835, for 6,000 bottles of Product, according to the terms therein, by no later than March 17, 2022. 4. For clarity, this preliminary injunction does not (i) relieve Bionpharma of its obligation under the Agreement to pay CoreRx for the Product to be manufactured and delivered pursuant to paragraphs 2 and 3 in accordance with the terms of such purchase orders, or (ii) otherwise relieve any party of its respective obligations under the Agreement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: 5. The parties should immediately commence mediation as set forth in the Agreement. 6. This case is stayed pending the conclusion of mediation or further order of the Court. 7. The parties shall submit a joint status report by February 28, 2022. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/4/2022) Case stayed. (ks)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Eli B. Richlin dated February 4, 2022 re: #76 LETTER MOTION to Expedite briefing schedule on Azurity's motion to intervene and for reconsideration addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Eli B. Richlin dated February 2, 2022. . Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Richlin, Eli)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #59 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Charles A. Weiss, Esq. dated Feb. 3, 2022 re: #76 LETTER MOTION to Expedite briefing schedule on Azurity's motion to intervene and for reconsideration addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Eli B. Richlin dated February 2, 2022. . Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Telephone Conference set for 2/4/2022 at 05:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 LETTER MOTION to Expedite briefing schedule on Azurity's motion to intervene and for reconsideration addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Eli B. Richlin dated February 2, 2022. Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DECLARATION of AMIT M. PATEL [REDACTED] in Support re: #66 MOTION to Intervene .. Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #66 MOTION to Intervene . [REDACTED]. Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Charles A. Weiss dated February 2, 2022 re: in response to the objections submitted by defendant CoreRx, Inc. (CoreRx) to Bionpharmas proposed form of preliminary injunction. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Transcript dated January 28, 2022).(Weiss, Charles)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of Filing of Sealed Ex. 14 to Declaration of Eli B. Richlin in Support of Motion to Intervene re: #69 Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #63 .(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of Filing of Sealed Ex. 7 to Declaration of Eli B. Richlin in Support of Motion to Intervene re: #69 Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #63 .(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECLARATION of ELI B. RICHLIN in Support re: #66 MOTION to Intervene .. Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14).(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of AMIT M. PATEL in Support re: #66 MOTION to Intervene .. Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #63 .(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #66 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #63 .(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Intervene . Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 DECLARATION of Eli B. Richlin in Support re: #63 MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #63 MOTION to Seal . . Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Seal . Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CutisPharma Intermediate Holdings Inc. for Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Richlin, Eli)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eli Bard Richlin on behalf of Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Richlin, Eli)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REDACTION to #59 Proposed Order, by Corerx, Inc..(Russ, Peter)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ***SELECTED PARTIES***PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Corerx, Inc., Bionpharma Inc.. Related Document Number: #50 . Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #21 .(Russ, Peter) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #58 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc.. Related Document Number: #50 ..(Weiss, Charles) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/25/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/25/2022 before Judge John G. Koeltl. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/18/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Copy of Agreement to supplement the arguments made in its papers in opposition to Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Peter S. Russ dated January 27, 2022. Document filed by Corerx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Russ, Peter)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Copy of Agreement to supplement the arguments made in its papers in opposition to Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Peter S. Russ dated January 27, 2022. Document filed by Corerx, Inc., Bionpharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #51 .(Russ, Peter)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #51 MOTION to Seal Defendant Letter Motion to supplement the arguments made in its papers in opposition to Plaintiff motion for a preliminary injunction, and the Exhibit A thereto. . Document filed by Corerx, Inc...(Russ, Peter)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DECLARATION of Peter S. Russ in Support re: #51 MOTION to Seal Defendant Letter Motion to supplement the arguments made in its papers in opposition to Plaintiff motion for a preliminary injunction, and the Exhibit A thereto.. Document filed by Corerx, Inc...(Russ, Peter)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to Seal Defendant Letter Motion to supplement the arguments made in its papers in opposition to Plaintiff motion for a preliminary injunction, and the Exhibit A thereto. Document filed by Corerx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Russ, Peter)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. The plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to close Docket No. 8. The parties should immediately begin mediation as provided in their Agreement, and the case is stayed pending such mediation. The plaintiff should submit a proposed preliminary injunction in two days. The defendant may submit any objections one day thereafter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/27/2022) (vfr)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Show Cause Hearing held on 1/25/2022. (Fletcher, Donnie)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Matthew L. Fedowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/21/2022) (ks)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #48 MOTION for Matthew L. Fedowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Matthew L. Fedowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Corerx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notarized Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice regarding M. Fedowitz, #2 Exhibit B - Virginia Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing regarding Matthew L. Fedowitz, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Weyand, Jacqueline)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Matthew L. Fedowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25603210. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Corerx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice regarding M. Fedowitz, #2 Exhibit B - Virginia Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing regarding Matthew L. Fedowitz, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Weyand, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/19/2022 (wb).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Revised Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Show Cause Hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #47 MOTION for Matthew L. Fedowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25603210. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit is not notarized.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Adjourned to Tuesday, January 25, 2022, at 9:30 AM. So Ordered. ( Show Cause Hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/13/22) (yv)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #29 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendant's Brief in Opposition to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Declaration and Exhibits. : Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/13/22) (yv)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference One Week due to Covid-19 addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Jacqueline Weyand dated January 13, 2022. Document filed by Corerx, Inc.. Return Date set for 1/18/2022 at 10:30 AM..(Weyand, Jacqueline)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Show Cause Hearing set for 1/18/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Bionpharmas Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Reply Declaration of Venkat Krishnan in Support of Bionpharmas Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Reply Declaration of Charles Weiss in Support of Plaintiff Bionpharmas Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Reply Declaration of Robert McSorley in Support of Bionpharmas Motion for a Preliminary Injunction served on Corex, Inc. on January 6, 2022. Service was made by the court's ECF system. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Robert McSorley in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S: curriculum vitae of Robert McSorley, #2 Exhibit T: screen shots).(Weiss, Charles)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Charles Weiss in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q: portions of e-mail exchange, #2 Exhibit R: portions of the trial transcript in Silvergate Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v Amneal Pharmaceuticals 19-678-LPS (D. Del)).(Weiss, Charles)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Venkat Krishnan in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION ON CONSENT AND ORDER EXTENDING CORERX'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: The above application is ORDERED GRANTED. CoreRx's time to respond to the Complaint is extended to January 28, 2022. This 31 day of December 2021., Motions terminated: #38 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint with Proposed Order addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Jacqueline M. Weyand dated December 30, 2021. filed by Corerx, Inc.., (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/31/2021) Corerx, Inc. answer due 1/28/2022. (ks)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint with Proposed Order addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Jacqueline M. Weyand dated December 30, 2021. Document filed by Corerx, Inc...(Weyand, Jacqueline)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Brief in Opposition to Preliminary Injunction, Supporting Declaration and Expert Declaration served on Bionpharma Inc. on 12/29/2021. Document filed by Corerx, Inc...(Russ, Peter)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Ivan T. Hofmann in Opposition re: #5 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Declaration and Exhibits.. Document filed by Corerx, Inc., Bionpharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #29 .(Russ, Peter)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** OPPOSITION BRIEF re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by Corerx, Inc., Bionpharma Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #29 .(Russ, Peter)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECLARATION of Ivan T. Hofmann in Opposition re: #5 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Declaration and Exhibits.. Document filed by Corerx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22).(Russ, Peter)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DECLARATION of Ajay Damani in Opposition re: #5 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Declaration and Exhibits.. Document filed by Corerx, Inc...(Russ, Peter)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPPOSITION BRIEF re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by Corerx, Inc...(Russ, Peter)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECLARATION of Peter S. Russ in Support re: #29 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendant's Brief in Opposition to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Declaration and Exhibits.. Document filed by Corerx, Inc...(Russ, Peter)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendant's Brief in Opposition to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Declaration and Exhibits. . Document filed by Corerx, Inc...(Russ, Peter)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendant's Brief in Opposition to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Declaration and Exhibits. Document filed by Corerx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Russ, Peter)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ***SELECTED PARTIES***AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 Memorandum of Law in Support, (corrected date on page 3). Document filed by Bionpharma Inc., Corerx, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #5 .(Weiss, Charles)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 Memorandum of Law in Support (corrected date on page 3). Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Corerx, Inc. served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. Service was accepted by Peter S. Ross, Esq., Counsel for Defendant. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Now therefore, subject to the Court's approval, the parties stipulate and agree as follows: 1. CoreRx shall file and serve its opposition to Bionpharma's motion for a preliminary injunction by December 29, 2021; 2. Bionpharma shall file and serve its reply by January 6, 2021. 3. The Court will hear argument on the motion on January 18, 2022, commencing at 10:30 am. The parties will present evidence by affidavit or declaration, without live testimony. As further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/15/2021) ( Responses due by 12/29/2021, Replies due by 1/6/2021.) (ks)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The time to submit joint or separate letters addressing the matters raised at the December 14, 2021 conference is extended to December 15, 2021 at 5:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/15/2021) (ate)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: As stated at the conference held today, a conference is scheduled for December 16, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. The parties may access the conference using the following dial-in: 888-363-4749, with access code 8140049. The parties are directed to submit joint or separate letters addressing the matters raised at the conference held today by December 15, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/14/2021) (ks)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (ks)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Show Cause Hearing held on 12/14/2021. (Fletcher, Donnie)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal. it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Seal is GRANTED, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the (i) specific portions of Plaintiff Bionpharma's Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (ii) specific portions of the Declaration of Venkat Krishnan in support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (iii) specific portions of Exhibits F, I, J, L, M, N, and O to the Declaration of Venkat Krishnan, and (iv) specific portions of the Declaration of Marisa Marinelli, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff Bionpharma's Application for Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraints, and Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall remain redacted in the public record of this case. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/14/2021) (js)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marisa A. Marinelli on behalf of Bionpharma Inc...(Marinelli, Marisa)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacqueline M Weyand on behalf of Corerx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service).(Weyand, Jacqueline)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Stephen Russ on behalf of Corerx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service).(Russ, Peter)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Corerx, Inc...(gp)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (gp)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Show Cause Hearing set for today, 12/14/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Show Cause Hearing set for 12/16/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of all documents served on Corerx, Inc. on 12/13/2021. Service was made by Email to Peter S. Russ, Rajiv Khanna and Matthew L. Fedowitz.. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Marisa Marinelli in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc., Corerx, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #5 .(Marinelli, Marisa)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Venkat Krishnan in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc., Corerx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J, #4 Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit M, #6 Exhibit N, #7 Exhibit O)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #5 .(Weiss, Charles)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc., Corerx, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #5 .(Weiss, Charles)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Iltifat Hasan in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Marinelli, Marisa)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of Marisa Marinelli in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P).(Marinelli, Marisa)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Venkat Krishnan in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J, #6 Exhibit K, #7 Exhibit L, #8 Exhibit M, #9 Exhibit N, #10 Exhibit O).(Weiss, Charles)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Marisa Marinelli in Support re: #5 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Declaration and Exhibits.. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Marinelli, Marisa)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Declaration and Exhibits. . Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Declaration and Exhibits. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Weiss, Charles)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CoreRx, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bionpharma Inc...(Weiss, Charles)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weiss, Charles)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corerx, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25462887)Document filed by Bionpharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Weiss, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bionpharma Inc. v. Corerx, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bionpharma Inc.
Represented By: Charles Alan Weiss
Represented By: Marisa A. Marinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corerx, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline M Weyand
Represented By: Peter Stephen Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Eli Bard Richlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?