OC Global Partners, LLC v. Lirdes S.A. et al
Plaintiff: OC GLOBAL PARTNERS, LLC
Defendant: Luis Felipe Adaime and LIRDES S.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10686
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on March 4, 2022, at 4:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 3/4/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/11/2022) (ate)
February 8, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #18 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #11 Order on Motion to Serve,, . Defendants by Alternative Means of Service. Document filed by OC Global Partners, LLC..(Pastore, Joseph)
February 7, 2022 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #20 Status Report. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (lb)
February 3, 2022 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #11 Order on Motion to Serve,, . . Document filed by Luis Felipe Adaime, Lirdes S.A...(Raux, Geoffrey)
February 3, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #11 Order on Motion to Serve,, . Document filed by Luis Felipe Adaime, Lirdes S.A...(Raux, Geoffrey)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Geoffrey M. Raux dated February 3, 2022. Responses due by 3/2/2022 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
February 3, 2022 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Geoffrey M. Raux dated February 3, 2022. Document filed by Luis Felipe Adaime, Lirdes S.A...(Raux, Geoffrey)
January 27, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick James Rodriguez on behalf of Luis Felipe Adaime, Lirdes S.A...(Rodriguez, Patrick)
January 27, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Michael Raux on behalf of Luis Felipe Adaime, Lirdes S.A...(Raux, Geoffrey)
January 21, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint and Memorandum and Order served on LIRDES S.A. and Luis Felipe Adaime on 01/20/22. Document filed by OC Global Partners, LLC..(Pastore, Joseph)
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint and Memorandum and Order served on LIRDES S.A. and Luis Felipe Adaime on 01/20/22. Document filed by OC Global Partners, LLC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Luis Felipe Adaime served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022; Lirdes S.A. served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022. Document filed by OC Global Partners, LLC..(Pastore, Joseph)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #10 Motion to Serve LIRDES S.A. (LIRDES) and Luis Felipe Adaime. Plaintiff OC Global Partners, LLC ("Plaintiff") moves, pursuant to Rules 4(f) and 4(h)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, for an order permitting alternative service of the summons and complaint on Defendants LIRDES S.A. ("LIRDES") and Luis Felipe Adaime ("Adaime" and, collectively with LIRDES, "Defendants") by email at luisadaime@moss.earth. Dkt No. 10. The motion is granted. (As further set forth herein.) The motion for alternative service is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 1/20/2022) (va)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Serve Defendants by Alternative Means of Service. Document filed by OC Global Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration).(Pastore, Joseph)
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Rose McClammy on behalf of OC Global Partners, LLC..(McClammy, Melissa)
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph M. Pastore, III on behalf of OC Global Partners, LLC..(Pastore, Joseph)
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph M. Pastore, III on behalf of OC Global Partners, LLC..(Pastore, Joseph)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Luis Felipe Adaime, Lirdes S.A...(gp)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LIRDES S.A.; LUIS FELIPE ADAIME, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by OC Global Partners, LLC..(Pastore, Joseph)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Luis Felipe Adaime, Lirdes S.A.. Document filed by OC Global Partners, LLC..(Pastore, Joseph)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pastore, Joseph)
December 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lirdes S.A.. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $7,500,000,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $7,500,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
December 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joseph M. Pastore, III to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
December 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph M. Pastore, III to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
December 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph M. Pastore, III. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: OC Global Partners, LLC, Lirdes S.A.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
December 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
December 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph M. Pastore, III to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party as to whom the summons request is for must be listed in docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
December 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
December 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OC GLOBAL PARTNERS, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by OC GLOBAL PARTNERS, LLC..(Pastore, Joseph) Modified on 12/15/2021 (sj).
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25467772)Document filed by OC GLOBAL PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Pastore, Joseph) Modified on 12/15/2021 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OC Global Partners, LLC v. Lirdes S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OC GLOBAL PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Joseph M. Pastore, III
Represented By: Melissa Rose McClammy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Felipe Adaime
Represented By: Geoffrey Michael Raux
Represented By: Patrick James Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIRDES S.A.
Represented By: Geoffrey Michael Raux
Represented By: Patrick James Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?