Access Business Group International, LLC et al v. Refresco Beverages US Inc.
Plaintiff: Access Business Group International, LLC and Access Business Group LLC
Defendant: Refresco Beverages US Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10779
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The application for an extension is GRANTED. By March 11, 2022, Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 10. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/2/2022) (tg)
February 2, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Refresco Beverages US Inc. answer due 3/11/2022. (tg)
February 1, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Refresco Beverages US Inc. served on 1/19/2022, answer due 2/9/2022. Service was accepted by Mary Cate Ducan. Document filed by Access Business Group International, LLC; Access Business Group LLC..(Bardelli, Edward)
February 1, 2022 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Edwin M. Baum dated February 1, 2022. Document filed by Refresco Beverages US Inc...(Baum, Edwin)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Initial Conference by telephone set for 3/16/2022 at 4:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/31/2022) (vfr)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bardelli, Edward)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Refresco Beverages US Inc...(pc)
December 17, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 17, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward J. Bardelli. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
December 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Edward J. Bardelli to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Second page is missing;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
December 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Edward J. Bardelli. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Access Business Group International, LLC, Access Business Group LLC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward J. Bardelli on behalf of Access Business Group International, LLC, Access Business Group LLC..(Bardelli, Edward)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Access Business Group LLC..(Bardelli, Edward)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Access Business Group International, LLC..(Bardelli, Edward)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bardelli, Edward) Modified on 12/17/2021 (pc).
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Refresco Beverages US, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Access Business Group International, LLC, Access Business Group LLC..(Bardelli, Edward)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Refresco Beverages US Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25479321)Document filed by Access Business Group International, LLC, Access Business Group LLC..(Bardelli, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Access Business Group International, LLC et al v. Refresco Beverages US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Access Business Group International, LLC
Represented By: Edward J. Bardelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Access Business Group LLC
Represented By: Edward J. Bardelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refresco Beverages US Inc.
Represented By: Edwin Mark Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?