Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Kuehne + Nagel Inc.
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Kuehne + Nagel Inc. doing business as Blue Anchor America Line
3Rd Party Defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10857
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Flood, Edward)
February 7, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #8 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Flood, Edward)
February 7, 2022 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Flood, Edward)
January 24, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Third Party Complaint. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. Service was accepted by Christine B., Receptionist. Document filed by Kuehne + Nagel Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (vf)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (vf)
January 11, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #8 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Kuehne + Nagel Inc. d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line..(Dooley, Teresa)
January 11, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #8 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Kuehne + Nagel Inc. d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line..(Dooley, Teresa)
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A..Document filed by Kuehne + Nagel Inc. d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint).(Dooley, Teresa)
January 11, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kuehne + Nagel Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Kuehne + Nagel International AG for. Document filed by Kuehne + Nagel Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
January 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Teresa H Dooley. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Kuehne + Nagel Inc. d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line as party role Third Party Plaintiff. The party was added to the case in error (Duplicate Party). (vf)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kuehne + Nagel Inc...(gp)
December 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
December 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
December 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kuehne + Nagel Inc. d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(O'Malley, Kevin)
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Phoenix Insurance Company for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(O'Malley, Kevin)
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Malley, Kevin)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kuehne + Nagel Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25487660)Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(O'Malley, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Kuehne + Nagel Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Kevin John Byron O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuehne + Nagel Inc. doing business as Blue Anchor America Line
Represented By: Teresa H Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Represented By: Edward P. Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?