Nostalgic Partners, LLC et al v. The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball
Plaintiff: Nostalgic Partners, LLC, d/b/a The Staten Island Yankees, Oneonta Athletic Corporation, d/b/a The Norwich Sea Unicorns, Sports Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Salem-Keizer Volcanoes, Tri-City ValleyCats, Inc., Nostalgic Partners, LLC doing business as The Staten Island Yankees, Oneonta Athletic Corporation doing business as The Norwich Sea Unicorns and Sports Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Salem-Keizer Volcanoes
Defendant: The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, an Unincorporated Association d/b/a Major League Baseball and The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball an Unincorporated Association d/b/a Major League Baseball
Case Number: 1:2021cv10876
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SERVICE AND SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: NOW THEREFORE, Plaintiffs and Defendant jointly stipulate and agree as follows: 1. Defendant's counsel agrees to accept service of the Complaint on Defendant's behalf, and Defendant hereby waives any objections with respect to the sufficiency of service of the Complaint; 2. Defendant does not waive, and hereby expressly reserves, all rights and defenses except for any defense with respect to the sufficiency of service of the Complaint; 3. Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint shall be extended to February 18, 2022; and 4. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original and together will constitute one document. An electronic signature on this Stipulation will be considered an original signature. SO STIPULATED AND AGREED. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation set forth above, it is so ordered. The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball answer due 2/18/2022. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/3/2022) (ate)
December 29, 2021 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball..(Hardiman, John)
December 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Robert Walker on behalf of The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball..(Walker, Benjamin)
December 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Louis Hardiman on behalf of The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball..(Hardiman, John)
December 29, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Nostalgic Partners, LLC, Oneonta Athletic Corporation, Sports Enterprises, Inc., Tri-City ValleyCats, Inc...(Schreiber, Zachary)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball..(pc)
December 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Lender. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Richmond;. (pc)
December 21, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Lender. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Nostalgic Partners, LLC, d/b/a The Staten Island Yankees, Sports Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Salem-Keizer Volcanoes, Oneonta Athletic Corporation, d/b/a The Norwich Sea Unicorns, The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, an Unincorporated Association d/b/a Major League Baseball. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
December 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James W. Quinn on behalf of Nostalgic Partners, LLC, d/b/a The Staten Island Yankees, Oneonta Athletic Corporation, d/b/a The Norwich Sea Unicorns, Sports Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Salem-Keizer Volcanoes, Tri-City ValleyCats, Inc...(Quinn, James)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Maria Burgess on behalf of Nostalgic Partners, LLC, d/b/a The Staten Island Yankees, Oneonta Athletic Corporation, d/b/a The Norwich Sea Unicorns, Sports Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Salem-Keizer Volcanoes, Tri-City ValleyCats, Inc...(Burgess, Emily)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Schreiber on behalf of Nostalgic Partners, LLC, d/b/a The Staten Island Yankees, Oneonta Athletic Corporation, d/b/a The Norwich Sea Unicorns, Sports Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Salem-Keizer Volcanoes, Tri-City ValleyCats, Inc...(Schreiber, Zachary)
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Shaun Hochstadt on behalf of Nostalgic Partners, LLC, d/b/a The Staten Island Yankees, Oneonta Athletic Corporation, d/b/a The Norwich Sea Unicorns, Sports Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Salem-Keizer Volcanoes, Tri-City ValleyCats, Inc...(Hochstadt, Eric)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tri-City ValleyCats, Inc...(Lender, David)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sports Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Salem-Keizer Volcanoes..(Lender, David)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nostalgic Partners, LLC, d/b/a The Staten Island Yankees..(Lender, David)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Oneonta Tigers LLC for Oneonta Athletic Corporation, d/b/a The Norwich Sea Unicorns. Document filed by Oneonta Athletic Corporation, d/b/a The Norwich Sea Unicorns..(Lender, David)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, an Unincorporated Association d/b/a Major League Baseball, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nostalgic Partners, LLC, d/b/a The Staten Island Yankees, Oneonta Athletic Corporation, d/b/a The Norwich Sea Unicorns, Sports Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Salem-Keizer Volcanoes, Tri-City ValleyCats, Inc...(Lender, David)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lender, David)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, an Unincorporated Association d/b/a Major League Baseball. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25489357)Document filed by Tri-City ValleyCats, Inc., Nostalgic Partners, LLC, d/b/a The Staten Island Yankees, Sports Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Salem-Keizer Volcanoes, Oneonta Athletic Corporation, d/b/a The Norwich Sea Unicorns..(Lender, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nostalgic Partners, LLC et al v. The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nostalgic Partners, LLC, d/b/a The Staten Island Yankees
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: Emily Maria Burgess
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Zachary Schreiber
Represented By: David Lender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oneonta Athletic Corporation, d/b/a The Norwich Sea Unicorns
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: Emily Maria Burgess
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Zachary Schreiber
Represented By: David Lender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sports Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Salem-Keizer Volcanoes
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: Emily Maria Burgess
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Zachary Schreiber
Represented By: David Lender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-City ValleyCats, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: Emily Maria Burgess
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Zachary Schreiber
Represented By: David Lender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nostalgic Partners, LLC doing business as The Staten Island Yankees
Represented By: David Lender
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: Emily Maria Burgess
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Zachary Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oneonta Athletic Corporation doing business as The Norwich Sea Unicorns
Represented By: David Lender
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: Emily Maria Burgess
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Zachary Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sports Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Salem-Keizer Volcanoes
Represented By: David Lender
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: Emily Maria Burgess
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Zachary Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, an Unincorporated Association d/b/a Major League Baseball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball an Unincorporated Association d/b/a Major League Baseball
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: John Louis Hardiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?