Keller v. NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Keller
Defendant: NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital, Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York and Pokala Ravi Kiran
Case Number: 1:2021cv10905
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Referring Judge: Lewis J Liman
2 Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Sex Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. No further extensions. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
June 2, 2023 Filing 53 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time through June 9, 2023 to restore the action to the Court's calendar pending finalization of settlement in principle addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Ariel Graff dated June 2, 2023. Document filed by Deborah Keller..(Graff, Ariel)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Letter Motion for Extension of Time (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
May 18, 2023 Filing 51 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time through June 2, 2023 to restore the action to the Court's calendar pending finalization of settlement in principle addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Ariel Graff dated May 18, 2023. Document filed by Deborah Keller..(Graff, Ariel)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER... It is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Courts calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within forty-five (45) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DISMISSED as moot, and all conferences and deadlines are CANCELLED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/3/23) (yv)
April 3, 2023 Filing 49 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay Pending Consummation of Settlement Agreement in Principle addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Ariel Graff dated April 3, 2023. Document filed by Deborah Keller..(Graff, Ariel)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application GRANTED. No further extensions shall be granted absent exigent circumstances and then only for a limited purpose. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 3/9/2023) (kv)
March 9, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 5/5/2023. (kv)
March 8, 2023 Filing 47 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Susan Friedfel dated March 8, 2023. Document filed by Pokala Ravi Kiran, Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York..(Friedfel, Susan)
March 6, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Dyess on behalf of NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital..(Dyess, Christopher)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 1/3/2023) (kv)
December 30, 2022 Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Daniel J. Green dated December 30, 2022 re: Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. Document filed by NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Protective Order Signed by Counsel, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redline of Changes).(Green, Daniel)
November 14, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Telephone Conference held on 11/14/2022. (kl)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application GRANTED. Further extensions shall be granted only for good cause shown. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 11/14/2022) (kv)
November 14, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 4/4/2023. (kv)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to appear for a telephone conference on Monday, November 14, 2022, at 2:30 p.m. to discuss the Joint Letter Motion filed at ECF No. 41. At the scheduled time, the parties shall each separately call (888) 278-0296 (or (214) 765-0479) and enter access code 6489745. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 11/14/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 11/9/2022) (kl)
November 8, 2022 Filing 41 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to facilitate private mediation scheduled for December 9 addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Ariel Graff dated November 8, 2022. Document filed by Deborah Keller..(Graff, Ariel)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #39 Letter filed by NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED IN PART. The deadline for the completion of fact discovery is extended until February 28, 2023. If the case has not settled by that date, the parties shall submit a proposed schedule for the completion of expert discovery no later than March 7, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Fact Discovery due by 2/28/2023.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/31/2022) (kv)
October 28, 2022 Filing 39 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Daniel J. Green dated October 28, 2022 re: Status Report. Document filed by NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital..(Green, Daniel)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Request GRANTED. No later than October 28, 2022, the parties shall file with the Court an updated status report. The parties are reminded that this case has been referred to me for general pretrial purposes and all communications regarding general pretrial matters should be addressed to me (as the prior correspondence in this was was addressed). (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron)(Text Only Order) (Aaron, Stewart)
October 24, 2022 Filing 37 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Susan D. Friedfel dated October 24, 2022. Document filed by Pokala Ravi Kiran, NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital, Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York..(Friedfel, Susan)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #35 Letter, filed by NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital, Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York, Pokala Ravi Kiran. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall file another joint status report on October 25, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/11/2022) (kv)
August 10, 2022 Filing 35 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Susan D. Friedfel dated August 10, 2022 re: Discovery Update. Document filed by Pokala Ravi Kiran, NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital, Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York..(Friedfel, Susan)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPORT OF RULE 26(f) MEETING AND CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The parties anticipate that this case will be ready for trial by 60 days after the later of the close of expert discovery or the disposition of a motion for summary judgment. The parties anticipate that the trial of this case will require 7 days. The parties do not consent to a trial before a Magistrate Judge at this time. The parties request a jury trial. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' proposed Case Management Plan is approved. If the parties want the Court to enter a Protective Order they must submit a proposed order for the Court's review. The parties may wish to consider the model Protective Orders utilized by Judge Liman or Judge Moses, which are available on the Court's website. The parties shall file a joint letter regarding the status of discovery on August 10, 2022. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2022. Deposition due by 1/6/2023. Fact Discovery due by 1/20/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/8/2022) (kv)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RULE 502(d) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. The production of privileged or work-product protected documents, electronically stored information ("ESI") or other information, whether inadvertent or otherwise, is not a waiver of the privilege or protection from discovery in this case or in any other federal or state proceeding. This Order shall be interpreted to provide the maximum protection allowed by Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). 2. Nothing contained herein is intended to or shall serve to limit a party's right to conduct a review of documents, ESI or other information (including metadata) for relevance, responsiveness and/or segregation of privileged and/or protected information before production. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/8/2022) (kv)
June 7, 2022 Filing 31 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital..(Rasnick, Lauri)
May 23, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ariel Yigal Graff on behalf of Deborah Keller..(Graff, Ariel)
April 28, 2022 MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 5/16/2022 will not be held. Mediation Status due by 5/13/2022.(mnp)
April 28, 2022 SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 5/31/2022 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
April 26, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/26/2022. (kl)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Following a telephone conference with the parties, it is hereby Ordered that, if this matter is not resolved during the upcoming mediation, the parties shall file a revised proposed case management plan no later than June 7, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/26/2022) (kv)
April 19, 2022 Filing 28 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Deborah Keller..(Vallas, George)
April 11, 2022 FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 5/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
April 11, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Alison J. Nathan is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
March 30, 2022 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 4/29/2022.(ah)
March 28, 2022 Filing 27 AMENDED ANSWER to #11 Complaint. Document filed by NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital..(Rasnick, Lauri)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 3/17/2022. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (jpt)
March 7, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to #11 Complaint. Document filed by NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital..(Rasnick, Lauri)
March 7, 2022 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital..(Rasnick, Lauri)
March 7, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauri Faith Rasnick on behalf of NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital..(Rasnick, Lauri)
March 7, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Lynn Jampol on behalf of NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital..(Jampol, Melissa)
March 7, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Stuart Frank on behalf of NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital..(Frank, James)
March 7, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Jared Green on behalf of NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital..(Green, Daniel)
March 7, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #11 Complaint. Document filed by Pokala Ravi Kiran, Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York..(Friedfel, Susan)
March 7, 2022 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York..(Friedfel, Susan)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Tuesday, April 26, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. The conference shall be conducted by telephone. At the scheduled time, the parties shall each separately call (888) 278-0296 (or (214) 765-0479) and enter access code 6489745. SO ORDERED. Telephonic Initial Conference set for 4/26/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 2/22/2022) (kl)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/18/2022) (vfr)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #11 Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Susan D. Friedfel dated 02/17/2022. SO ORDERED. #11 Complaint. Pokala Ravi Kiran answer due 3/7/2022; NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital answer due 3/7/2022; Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York answer due 3/7/2022. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/17/2022) (vfr)
February 17, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #11 Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Susan D. Friedfel dated 02/17/2022. Document filed by Pokala Ravi Kiran, Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York..(Friedfel, Susan)
February 17, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Deegan Friedfel on behalf of Pokala Ravi Kiran, Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York..(Friedfel, Susan)
February 17, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Poonam Sethi on behalf of Pokala Ravi Kiran, Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York..(Sethi, Poonam)
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 COMPLAINT against Pokala Ravi Kiran, NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital, Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York. Document filed by Deborah Keller..(Vallas, George)
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pokala Ravi Kiran..(pc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pokala Ravi Kiran, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Deborah Keller..(Vallas, George)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York..(gp)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital..(gp)
December 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
December 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney George Dean Vallas to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct, the party name on the PDF does not match the party name on the docket. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
December 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
December 21, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
December 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney George Dean Vallas to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Scott Goodstadt on behalf of Deborah Keller..(Goodstadt, Andrew)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Vallas, George)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Deborah Keller..(Vallas, George)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pokala Ravi Kiran, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Deborah Keller..(Vallas, George) Modified on 12/21/2021 (gp).
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Deborah Keller..(Vallas, George)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25493154)Document filed by Deborah Keller..(Vallas, George) Modified on 12/21/2021 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Keller
Represented By: Andrew Scott Goodstadt
Represented By: George Dean Vallas
Represented By: Ariel Yigal Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital
Represented By: Daniel Jared Green
Represented By: James Stuart Frank
Represented By: Lauri Faith Rasnick
Represented By: Melissa Lynn Jampol
Represented By: Christopher Dyess
Represented By: Susan Deegan Friedfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York
Represented By: Susan Deegan Friedfel
Represented By: Poonam Sethi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pokala Ravi Kiran
Represented By: Susan Deegan Friedfel
Represented By: Poonam Sethi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?