Iraq Telecom Limited v. IBL Bank S.A.L.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10940
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 201 Enforcement of Convention

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER: A conference was held in this case on January 4, 2023. As stated on the record at the conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file by January 9 at 12:00 p.m. the proposed order of attachment. If there is any disagreement regarding the language of the proposed order, each party shall also submit a letter no longer than two (2) pages identifying the disagreement. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/4/2023) (ks)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER: A conference in the above-captioned case has been scheduled for January 4, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties Iraq Telecom Ltd. (Iraq Telecom) and Intercontinental Bank of Lebanon S.A.L . ("IBL") shall be prepared to address the following topics: And as set forth herein., ( Status Conference set for 1/4/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/23/2022) (ama)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a conference shall be held in this case on January 4, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 18B at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. ( Status Conference set for 1/4/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/15/2022) (vfr)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting 171 Letter Motion to Seal. Approved. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/18/2022) (vfr)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 159 Letter Motion to Seal. Granted.. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/2/2022) (ks)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 152 Letter Motion to Seal. Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/2/2022) (tg)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting 142 Letter Motion to Seal. Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/18/2022) (vfr)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer as to whether an attachment in the amount of $17 million is appropriate. If the parties fail to reach an agreement as to the amount of the attachment, the parties shall by September 16, 2022 propose a briefing schedule resolving any open issue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/29/2022) (tg)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 FINAL JUDGMENT: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Respondent IBL Bank S.A.L. shall pay Petitioner Iraq Telecom Limited $2,895,924.78, comprised of the amount of the award, $2,755,938.21, plus $139,986.56 in interest ac crued on the Award at a rate of9%, from September 21, 2021, to the date of entry of this judgment. Pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Clerk is ordered to enter this Judgment forthwith and without further notice. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/15/2022) (ama) Modified on 4/15/2022 (ama).
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER: An Opinion granting the petition to confirm a foreign arbitral award in the above-captioned case was filed today. It is hereby ORDERED that the Petitioner shall present a proposed judgment consistent with the April 8 Opinion to the Respondent by April 12, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file the proposed judgement with any objections to its terms by April 14, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/8/2022) (vfr)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER: As stated on the record at an Oral Argument held on March 16, it is hereby ORDERED that IBL shall file opposition to Iraq Telecom's December 14, 2021 verified petition to confirm a foreign arbitration award by March 25, 2022. Any reply shall be filed by April 1. The parties shall provide the Court with two courtesy copies of their submissions at the time they are filed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/16/2022) (jca)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDERED that the parties Iraq Telecom Ltd. and Intercontinental Bank of Lebanon S.A.L. shall be prepared to address the following questions, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on March 14, 2022) (ST)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that an oral argument will be held on Wednesday March 16, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all individuals seeking entry to 500 Pearl Street must complete a questionnaire before being allowed entry into the courthouse. To gain entry to 500 Pearl Street, follow the instructions provided here, as further set forth in this Order. ( Oral Argument set for 3/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/2/2022) (vfr)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re: 78 Letter filed by IBL Bank S.A.L., 79 Letter, filed by Iraq Telecom Limited, 80 Letter filed by IBL Bank S.A.L. ORDERED that IBL's proposed briefing schedule is adopted. IBL shall file opposition to Iraq Telecom� 39;s January 31 motion to confirm and any cross-motion by February 14. Iraq Telecom's reply in support of its motion and opposition to IBL's cross-motion, if any, shall be filed by February 28. Any reply shall be due by March 14. The parties shall provide the Court with two courtesy copies of their submissions at the time they are filed. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on February 4, 2022) (ST)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SEALED ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that petitioner Iraq Telecom shall promptly serve the respondent IBL with the January 19 Order of Attachment, making such redactions to the Order as Iraq Telecom believes necessary. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any redactions shall be subject to review of the Court. This document was previously filed under seal in envelope # 12 and unsealed by docket entry 39 . (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/27/2022) (ate)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall unseal all documents and Orders filed in the above-captioned case, except for the following documents: (1) Iraq Telecom's Verified Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration, dated Decemb er 14, 2021 (the "Petition")(34 pages); (2) Exhibit F attached to the Petition, dated December 8, 2020 (37 pages); (3) Exhibit D attached to the Petition, dated April 23, 2021 (188 pages); (4) Exhibit H attached to the Petition, dated Novem ber 6, 2021 (41 pages); (5) Exhibit I attached to the Petition, dated November 22, 2021 (37 pages); (6) Iraq Telecom's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion for an Ex Parte Attachment, dated December 21, 2021 (31 pages); and (7) Iraq Telec om's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Renewed Motion for an Ex Parte Attachment, dated December 29, 2021 (31 pages). (8) Iraq Telecom's partial motion and supporting documents filed today, January 28, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Ir aq Telecom's January 28 motion to file the above documents with redactions is granted. The petitioner shall promptly file the documents in redacted form on ECF. The petitioner shall also file under seal an unredacted version of each document. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/28/2022) (vfr) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SEALED ORDER: On December 22, 2021, an Order denied an ex parte motion for attachment filed by the petitioner, Iraq Telecom Limited ("Iraq Telecom"), without prejudice. Iraq Telecom renewed its motion on December 29. It is hereby ORDER ED that this action shall remain sealed pending a further Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Iraq Telecom shall promptly file a proposed Order of Attachment that identifies the specific funds it seeks to attach by identifying the account numbers and banks. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/3/2022) (tg) *** This document was previously filed under seal in envelope #8 and unsealed by docket entry 13 (the unsealing Order). Modified on 1/28/2022 (tg).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iraq Telecom Limited v. IBL Bank S.A.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?