Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP v. Kore Infrastructure LLC
Plaintiff: Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP
Defendant: Kore Infrastructure LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv10943
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ac
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: On February 18, 2022, the parties in the above-captioned case informed the Court that the parties had reached a settlement in principle. Accordingly, the case is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with leave to any party to move within 30 days from the date hereof to reopen the case and proceed to trial if the settlement is not fully effectuated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/18/2022) (vfr)
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Court Conference (ECF Doc No. 10) served on Thomas F. Meagher, Esq. on February 2, 2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP..(Cahn, Aaron)
February 1, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888)363- 4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 2/28/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/1/2022) (tg)
February 1, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Thomas F. Meagher, Esq. on February 1, 2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP..(Lewis, Alan)
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan S. Lewis on behalf of Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP..(Lewis, Alan)
January 31, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 1/31/2022. The Court granted Defendants unopposed application for an extension of time to file its answer to 3/1/22, one day after the initial pre-trial conference, at which Defendant may request additional time if necessary. (Kotowski, Linda)
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas F. Meagher on behalf of Kore Infrastructure LLC..(Meagher, Thomas)
January 13, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Kore Infrastructure LLC served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. Service was accepted by Lyanne Gares, Litigation Services Manager at Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent for Kore Infrastructure LLC. Document filed by Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP..(Cahn, Aaron)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kore Infrastructure LLC..(pc)
December 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Aaron Ronald Cahn. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $120,390,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $120,000;. (pc)
December 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kore Infrastructure LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP..(Cahn, Aaron)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP..(Cahn, Aaron)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cahn, Aaron)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kore Infrastructure LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25497878)Document filed by Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP..(Cahn, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP v. Kore Infrastructure LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP
Represented By: Aaron Ronald Cahn
Represented By: Alan S. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kore Infrastructure LLC
Represented By: Thomas F. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?