Ritzmann v. Mainetti USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ellen Ritzmann
Defendant: Mainetti USA, Inc., Roberto Peruzzo, Jeffrey Hsu and Steve Regino
Case Number: 1:2021cv11048
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:22-cv-00566, filed on 02/04/2022. (sjo)
January 27, 2022 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (mml)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: For the purposes of venue, a civil action may be brought in "(1) a judicial district in which any defendant resides, if all defendants are residents of the State in which the district is located; (2) a judicial district in which a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred, or a substantial part of property that is the subject of the action is situated; or (3) if there is no district in which an action may otherwise be brought as provided in this section, any judicial district in which any defendant is subject to the court's personal jurisdiction with respect to such action."28 U.S.C. 1391(b). Based on Plaintiff's factual allegations, it appears that the District of New Jersey is the district in which "a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to [Plaintiff's] claim[s] occurred." 28 U.S.C. 1391(b). Accordingly, "in the interest of justice," the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case under 28 U.S.C. 1406 to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/27/2022) (mml) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
January 25, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Roberto Peruzzo waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. Document filed by Ellen Ritzmann..(Goddard, Megan)
January 25, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jeffrey Hsu waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. Document filed by Ellen Ritzmann..(Goddard, Megan)
January 25, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Steve Regino waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. Document filed by Ellen Ritzmann..(Goddard, Megan)
January 25, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mainetti USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. Document filed by Ellen Ritzmann..(Goddard, Megan)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Order to Show Cause,, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Megan S. Goddard, Esq. dated January 7, 2022. GRANTED. By January 25, 2022, Plaintiff shall respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause, ECF No. 11. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/11/2022) (kv)
January 11, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 1/25/2022. (kv)
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Order to Show Cause,, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Megan S. Goddard, Esq. dated January 7, 2022. Document filed by Ellen Ritzmann..(Goddard, Megan)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall show cause in writing, by January 11, 2022, why this action should not be transferred. If Plaintiff fails to respond within the time allowed, or fails to show that venue is proper in the Southern District of New York and that the action should not be transferred in the interest of justice, the Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/4/22) (yv)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steve Regino..(gp)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roberto Peruzzo..(gp)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mainetti USA, Inc...(gp)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Hsu..(gp)
December 27, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
December 27, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
December 27, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
December 23, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steve Regino, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ellen Ritzmann..(Goddard, Megan)
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeffrey Hsu, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ellen Ritzmann..(Goddard, Megan)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roberto Perruzo, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ellen Ritzmann..(Goddard, Megan)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mainetti USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ellen Ritzmann..(Goddard, Megan)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goddard, Megan)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Hsu, Mainetti USA, Inc., Roberto Peruzzo, Steve Regino. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25508548)Document filed by Ellen Ritzmann..(Goddard, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritzmann v. Mainetti USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Ritzmann
Represented By: Megan Sarah Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainetti USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Peruzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Regino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?