136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC v. Razinski et al
Plaintiff: 136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC
Defendant: Alexander Razinski, Tanya Razinski and Invar International Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11076
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John F Keenan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 294 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #10 Complaint against Invar International Holdings Inc., Alexander Razinski, Tanya Razinski.Document filed by 136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC. Related document: #10 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Master Agreement, #2 Exhibit Invar Guarantee).(Baker, Mitchell)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Mailed a Notice of Case Reassignment to Alexander Razinski; Tanya Razinski at P.O. Box 8184 White Plains, NY 10602. (aea)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John F. Keenan. Judge Louis L. Stanton is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE of Notices of Pro Se Appearance, Answer to Complaint & Counterclaim, served on 136 Field Point Circle Holding Co., LLC on 2/2/22. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Alexander Razinski, Tanya Razinski. (sc)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from A. Razinski and T. Razinski dated 2/2/22 re: MOTION LETTER TO REQUEST DISJOINMENT OF DEFENDANT INVAR INTERNATIONAL HOLDING, INC. IN THE MATTER OF 136 FIELD POINT CIRCLE HOLDING COMPANY, LLC V. ALEXANDER RAZINSKI ET AL. Document filed by Alexander Razinski, Tanya Razinski.(sc)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT & COUNTERCLAIM, re: to #10 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against 136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC. Document filed by Tanya Razinski, Alexander Razinski.(sc)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE by Tanya Razinski. (sc)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE, by Alexander Razinski. (sc)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Invar International Holdings Inc. served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. Service was accepted by Katie Bush, Sec. of State Employee. Document filed by 136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC..(Baker, Mitchell)
January 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Complaint. Alexander Razinski served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022; Tanya Razinski served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. Service was accepted by John Doe. Document filed by 136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC..(Baker, Mitchell)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Invar International Holdings Inc., Alexander Razinski, Tanya Razinski. Document filed by 136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Master Agreement).(Baker, Mitchell)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alexander Razinski..(gp)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tanya Razinski..(gp)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Invar International Holdings Inc...(gp)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mitchell John Baker to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all the party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (gp)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (gp)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC..(Baker, Mitchell)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Baker, Mitchell)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Invar International Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by 136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC..(Baker, Mitchell)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tanya Razinski, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by 136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC..(Baker, Mitchell)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alexander Razinski, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by 136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC..(Baker, Mitchell)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Invar International Holdings Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25511988)Document filed by 136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Master Agreement).(Baker, Mitchell) Modified on 12/28/2021 (gp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC v. Razinski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 136 Field Point Circle Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell John Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Razinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Razinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invar International Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?