Enriquez et al v. 189 Chrystie Street Partners, LP et al
Plaintiff: Juan Jesus Mata Enriquez and Javal Encarnacion
Defendant: 189 Chrystie Street Partners, LP doing business as The Box, Variety Worldwide LLC, Simon Hammerstein and Javier Vivas
Case Number: 1:2021cv11195
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fl Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. 189 Chrystie Street Partners, LP waiver sent on 1/18/2022, answer due 3/21/2022; Simon Hammerstein waiver sent on 1/18/2022, answer due 3/21/2022; Variety Worldwide LLC waiver sent on 1/18/2022, answer due 3/21/2022; Javier Vivas waiver sent on 1/18/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. Document filed by Juan Jesus Mata Enriquez; Javal Encarnacion..(Lipsky, Douglas)
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Variety Worldwide LLC..(gp)
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simon Hammerstein..(gp)
January 3, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Javier Vivas..(gp)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 189 Chrystie Street Partners, LP..(gp)
January 3, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
January 3, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
January 3, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
January 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Douglas Brian Lipsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (gp)
December 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Jacqueline Isaacson on behalf of Javal Encarnacion, Juan Jesus Mata Enriquez..(Isaacson, Sara)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Javier Vivas, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Javal Encarnacion, Juan Jesus Mata Enriquez..(Lipsky, Douglas)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simon Hammerstein, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Javal Encarnacion, Juan Jesus Mata Enriquez..(Lipsky, Douglas)
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Variety Worldwide LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Javal Encarnacion, Juan Jesus Mata Enriquez..(Lipsky, Douglas)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 189 Chrystie Street Partners, LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Javal Encarnacion, Juan Jesus Mata Enriquez..(Lipsky, Douglas)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lipsky, Douglas)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 189 Chrystie Street Partners, LP, Simon Hammerstein, Variety Worldwide LLC, Javier Vivas. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25525613)Document filed by Juan Jesus Mata Enriquez, Javal Encarnacion..(Lipsky, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enriquez et al v. 189 Chrystie Street Partners, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jesus Mata Enriquez
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Represented By: Douglas Brian Lipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javal Encarnacion
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Represented By: Douglas Brian Lipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 189 Chrystie Street Partners, LP doing business as The Box
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Variety Worldwide LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Hammerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Vivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?