DarkPulse, Inc. v. FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DarkPulse, Inc.
Defendant: FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC and Eli Fireman
Case Number: 1:2021cv11222
Filed: December 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 sv Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/21/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/21/2022 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Horovitz, (212) 805-0348. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/24/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing, DarkPulse's motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/21/2022) (ama)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 BRIEF re: #14 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,, Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by DarkPulse, Inc...(Passanante, Gustave)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC..(Marks, Aaron)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of Aaron H. Marks in Opposition re: #14 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,,. Document filed by Eli Fireman, FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Exhibit J, #5 Exhibit K, #6 Exhibit L).(Marks, Aaron)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECLARATION of Eli Fireman in Opposition re: #14 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,,. Document filed by Eli Fireman, FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Marks, Aaron)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #14 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,, . Document filed by Eli Fireman, FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC..(Marks, Aaron)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 BRIEF re: #14 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,, . Document filed by DarkPulse, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 O'Leary Declaration, #3 Exhibit Historical Data, #4 Exhibit Market Capital Spreadsheet).(Passanante, Gustave)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia Devereux Harper on behalf of Eli Fireman, FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC..(Harper, Julia)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Byron De Angelo Mille Pacheco on behalf of Eli Fireman, FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC..(Pacheco, Byron)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Upon consideration of the Declaration of Dennis O' Leary, Dated January 14, 2022; Plaintiff's motion for Temporary restraining Order, and accompanying memorandum of law, it is hereby ORDERED, that Defendants FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC, and Eli Fireman ("Defendants") show cause before the Honorable Edgardo Ramos, U.S. District Judge of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, at courtroom 619, United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square in the City, County and State of New York on January 21, 20222 at 2:00 p.m. or a soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why an Order should not be issued. It is further ORDERED that delivery by Electronic Service via ECF and email of a copy of this Order to Show Cause and the papers upon which it is based upon Defendant or their counsel, who have agreed to accept service electronically, hall be deemed good and sufficient service thereof; it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff Darkpulse, Inc, must submit its motion for a preliminary injunction by January 17, 2022 and it is further ORDERED that answering papers, if any shall be electronically served no than Wednesday, January 19 by 6:00 pm. Reply papers by Thursday Jan. 20 by 6:00 pm. ( Show Cause Hearing set for 1/21/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos.), ( Motions due by 1/17/2022., Responses due by 1/19/2022, Replies due by 1/20/2022.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/14/2022) (ate)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Harvey Marks on behalf of Eli Fireman, FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC..(Marks, Aaron)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by DarkPulse, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit O'Leary).(Passanante, Gustave) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC waiver sent on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. Document filed by DarkPulse, Inc...(Passanante, Gustave)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Eli Fireman waiver sent on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. Document filed by DarkPulse, Inc...(Passanante, Gustave)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #12 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark R. Basile on behalf of DarkPulse, Inc...(Basile, Mark)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Benzenberg on behalf of DarkPulse, Inc...(Benzenberg, Eric)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eli Fireman..(sj)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC..(sj)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DarkPulse, Inc...(Passanante, Gustave)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Passanante, Gustave)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eli Fireman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by DarkPulse, Inc...(Passanante, Gustave)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by DarkPulse, Inc...(Passanante, Gustave)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eli Fireman, FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25526956)Document filed by DarkPulse, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3).(Passanante, Gustave)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DarkPulse, Inc. v. FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DarkPulse, Inc.
Represented By: Gustave Paul Passanante
Represented By: Eric Benzenberg
Represented By: Mark R. Basile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Harvey Marks
Represented By: Byron De Angelo Mille Pacheco
Represented By: Julia Devereux Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Fireman
Represented By: Aaron Harvey Marks
Represented By: Byron De Angelo Mille Pacheco
Represented By: Julia Devereux Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?