In Re Application Of Patokh Chodiev
Case Number: 1:2021mc00423
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: M 77 Application to have subpoena issued to person living in this district re: action in foreign cou

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: On May 6, 2022, Petitioner's attorney filed a declaration informing the Court that Respondent is in the process of complying with the subpoenas at issue in this case. ECF No. 32. Accordingly, by June 6, 2022, the parties shall file a joint status letter regarding Respondent's compliance with the subpoenas and the need for the Court's further intervention in this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/10/2022) (vfr)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: On October 15, 2021, Respondents filed a motion to vacate the Court's July 30, 2021, order granting Petitioner's request for discovery pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 and to quash subpoenas served on them by Petitioner. ECF Nos. 15-19. By November 15, 2021, Petitioner shall respond to Respondents' motion in a brief not to exceed 15 pages. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 11/15/2021.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/18/2021) (vfr)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 1 Letter Motion for Discovery. For the reasons stated above, the Petition is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 1. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/30/2021) (kv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Application Of Patokh Chodiev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?