Ralph M. Watson v. NY DOE 2 et al
Plaintiff: Ralph M. Watson
Defendant: Alphabet Inc., Does whose true names and capacities unknown,, Illinois Doe 1, Doe Company and NY DOE 2
Case Number: 1:2021mc00461
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Part One
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (182 in 1:19-cv-00533-JGK-DCF) Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Illinois Doe 1. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed briefing schedule is adopted. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in both Case Nos. 21cv04304 and 21mc00461. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 7/23/2021. Responses due by 8/13/2021. Replies due by 8/24/2021.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 7/15/2021) (mml)
July 8, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: Discovery Hearing held via telephone on 7/8/2021. (aba)
June 23, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. The parties should call Toll-Free Number: 877-411-9748 and use Access Code: 9612281. (aba)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:21-mc-00568. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
May 26, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER the present action to the Southern District of New York for further proceedings. (See Order for further details) Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 5/26/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner.The Court conferred with the parties regarding the status of the case. Court Recorder: ZoomGov 4/15/2021. (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 5/26/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner.The Court conferred with the parties regarding the status of the case. The Court sets a further status conference on April 15, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. Court Recorder: ZoomGov 4/12/2021. (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 5/26/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: This case was inadvertently processed and assigned as a civil case. Upon further review, a determination has been made that this filing should have been assigned as a miscellaneous case. Case No. 2:21-cv-02631 has been terminated. The new case number is: 2:21-mc-00568 AB (MRWx) (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 5/26/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 Text Only Entry. Attorneys admitted to practice in California added to the docket. Attorneys not admitted to practice in California must file an Application for Pro Hac Vice. The order was emailed to the parties. re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held. #6 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/26/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The matter will be set for a video conference on Monday, April 12, at 10 a.m. PT. (See Minute Order for further details) Attorney Michael Wayne Ayotte for Ralph M Watson added. Ryan Mrazik for Alphabet Inc. added. (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 5/26/2021.]
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REFERRING DMA DOE'S MOTION TO QUASH NON-PARTY SUBPOENA TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL R WILNER FOR HANDLING by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Motion to Quash Non-Party Subpoena is referred to Judge Wilner for handling. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/26/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 5/26/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Illinois DOE 1. (Dorny, A.) [Transferred from California Central on 5/26/2021.]
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by anonymous third-party Illinois DOE 1, re MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 served on March 25, 2021. (Dorny, A.) [Transferred from California Central on 5/26/2021.]
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION RELATED TO A SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: ACACDC-30988846 - Fee: $49, filed by anonymous third party Illinois DOE 1. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Louis Dorny, #2 Exhibit AA, #3 Exhibit BB, #4 Exhibit CC, #5 Exhibit DD, #6 Exhibit EE, #7 Exhibit FF, #8 Exhibit GG, #9 Exhibit HH, #10 Exhibit II, #11 Exhibit JJ, #12 Declaration of DMA DOE) (Attorney A. Louis Dorny added to party Illinois DOE 1(pty:dft))(Dorny, A.) [Transferred from California Central on 5/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ralph M. Watson v. NY DOE 2 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Mrazik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does whose true names and capacities unknown,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Doe 1
Represented By: A. Louis Dorny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NY DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph M. Watson
Represented By: Michael Wayne Ayotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?