Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC v. Tin-Rez Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC
Defendant: Tin-Rez Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021mc00776
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 MISCELLANEOUS TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Florida Southern; Case Number: 9:21-mc-81902. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
October 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENA. The Clerk of the Court is hereby ORDERED to transfer Innovatus motion to compel the production of subpoenaed documents from non-party Tin-Rez to the Southern District of New York, Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC v. Jonathan Neuman, Civil Action No. 1:18-cv-4252-LLS Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Bruce E. Reinhart for Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel DE#1 and any other dispositive matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Motion to File Portion of its Motion to Compel as well as Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto under Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Levy, Mark) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions (Levy, Mark) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District,, Notice of Filing Proposed Order to Motion to Compel Documents Responsive to Subpoena to Tin-Rez Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Levy, Mark) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Steven B. Feirson, Michael H. McGinley, Stuart T. Steinberg, mailing date October 13, 2021, (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Case Type when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (ebz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. (ebz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District . Filing fee $49.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15086012, filed by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levy, Mark) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2021.] Modified on 10/19/2021 (sjo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC v. Tin-Rez Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Steven B Feirson
Represented By: Stuart T. Steinberg
Represented By: Mark Andrew Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tin-Rez Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?