JAB Associates, Inc. v. Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Plaintiff: JAB Associates, Inc. and Just About Building Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00025
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Axis Surplus Insurance Company.Document filed by JAB Associates, Inc., Just About Building Associates, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Kraus, Matthew)
February 28, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/28/2022, ( Oral Argument set for 4/25/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff in courtroom 14B.)Defendants motion for leave to file a motion to dismiss is granted. The motion to dismiss and supporting papers are due 3/15/22. The opposition is due 3/29/22 and the reply is due 4/8/22. (Kotowski, Linda)
February 15, 2022 Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2022. Motions due by 6/27/2022. Responses due by 7/11/2022 Replies due by 7/18/2022. Deposition due by 5/20/2022. Discovery due by 6/13/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 8/8/2022. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/15/2022) (kv) Modified on 2/16/2022 (kv).
February 15, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/15/2022, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
February 8, 2022 Filing 11 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Until March 8, 2022. Document filed by Axis Surplus Insurance Company..(Brill, Melissa)
February 8, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent Passarelli on behalf of Axis Surplus Insurance Company..(Passarelli, Vincent)
February 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa F. Brill on behalf of Axis Surplus Insurance Company..(Brill, Melissa)
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JAB Associates, Inc...(Lee, Janet)
February 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Janet Jakyung Lee on behalf of JAB Associates, Inc...(Lee, Janet)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Axis Surplus Insurance Company served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by JAB Associates, Inc...(Kraus, Matthew)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Honorable Jed S. Rakoff, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this notice and enclosures, and to furnish Chambers with a copy of any transmittal letter(s). If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you should send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally, informing the party that any unrepresented party is required to appear at the conference in person. Finally, upon receipt of this notice, please immediately furnish Chambers with a courtesy copy of your complaint and F.R.C.P.Rule 7.1 Statement, if applicable.DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 2-15-2022, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:30 am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/27/22) (yv)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (vf)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Axis Surplus Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JAB Associates, Inc...(Kraus, Matthew)
January 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
January 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kraus, Matthew)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25532465)Document filed by JAB Associates, Inc...(Kraus, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAB Associates, Inc. v. Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAB Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew David Kraus
Represented By: Janet Jakyung Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Just About Building Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew David Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa F. Brill
Represented By: Vincent Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?