LG Electronics, Inc. v. Dolby Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LG Electronics, Inc.
Defendant: Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Dolby International AB and Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv00042
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Referring Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the respective parties, that all of Plaintiff's claims in this case are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that, as to all claims asserted in this case, each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/28/2022) (tg)
February 28, 2022 Filing 56 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc...(Weingaertner, Scott)
February 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Scott Weingaertner to RE-FILE Document #55 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal; the document was not signed by all parties who have appeared. Use the event type Proposed Stipulation and Order found under the event list Proposed Orders and attach the correct signed (scanned signature ink image) PDF. (tp)
February 25, 2022 Filing 55 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Weingaertner, Scott) Modified on 2/28/2022 (tp).
February 14, 2022 Filing 54 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Justin V. Lewis in Support re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #50 .(Weingaertner, Scott)
February 14, 2022 Filing 53 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY Declaration of Dr. Allan Shampine in Support of #12 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted]. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #50 .(Weingaertner, Scott)
February 14, 2022 Filing 52 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Myungin Ko in Support re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #50 .(Weingaertner, Scott)
February 14, 2022 Filing 51 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted]. . Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #50 .(Weingaertner, Scott)
February 14, 2022 Filing 50 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Scott T. Weingaertner dated February 14, 2022. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc...(Weingaertner, Scott)
February 8, 2022 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Jerry A. Hausman (REDACTED) in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Hausman Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Hausman Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to the Hausman Declaration (REDACTED)).(Michael, William)
February 8, 2022 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Paul Meyer (REDACTED) in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 to the Meyer Declaration, #2 Attachment 2 to the Meyer Declaration, #3 Attachment 3 to the Meyer Declaration (REDACTED).(Michael, William)
February 8, 2022 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Sugene Kim (REDACTED) in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K to the Kim Declaration (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit L to the Kim Declaration (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit M to the Kim Declaration (REDACTED), #4 Exhibit N to the Kim Declaration (REDACTED), #5 Exhibit O to the Kim Declaration (REDACTED)).(Michael, William)
February 8, 2022 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Moonbong Jang (REDACTED) in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Jang Declaration (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit B to the Jang Declaration (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit C to the Jang Declaration (REDACTED), #4 Exhibit D to the Jang Declaration (REDACTED), #5 Exhibit E to the Jang Declaration (REDACTED), #6 Exhibit F to the Jang Declaration (REDACTED), #7 Exhibit G to the Jang Declaration (REDACTED), #8 Exhibit H to the Jang Declaration (REDACTED), #9 Exhibit I to the Jang Declaration (REDACTED), #10 Exhibit J to the Jang Declaration (REDACTED)).(Michael, William)
February 8, 2022 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted]. (REDACTED). Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc...(Michael, William)
January 31, 2022 Filing 44 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Jerry A. Hausman (with PROPOSED REDACTIONS) in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Hausman Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Hausman Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to the Hausman Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #34 .(Michael, William)
January 31, 2022 Filing 43 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Paul Meyer (with PROPOSED REDACTIONS) in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 to the Meyer Declaration, #2 Attachment 2 to the Meyer Declaration, #3 Exhibit Attachment 3 to the Meyer Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #34 .(Michael, William)
January 31, 2022 Filing 42 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Sugene Kim (with PROPOSED REDACTIONS) in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K to the Kim Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS), #2 Exhibit L to the Kim Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS), #3 Exhibit M to the Kim Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS), #4 Exhibit N to the Kim Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS), #5 Exhibit O to the Kim Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #34 .(Michael, William)
January 31, 2022 Filing 41 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Moonbong Jang (with PROPOSED REDACTIONS) in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Jang Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS), #2 Exhibit B to the Jang Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS), #3 Exhibit C to the Jang Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS), #4 Exhibit D to the Jang Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS), #5 Exhibit E to the Jang Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS), #6 Exhibit F to the Jang Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS), #7 Exhibit G to the Jang Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS), #8 Exhibit H to the Jang Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS), #9 Exhibit I to the Jang Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS), #10 Exhibit J to the Jang Declaration (PROPOSED REDACTIONS))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #34 .(Michael, William)
January 31, 2022 Filing 40 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted]. (PROPOSED REDACTIONS). Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #34 .(Michael, William)
January 31, 2022 Filing 39 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Jerry A. Hausman in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Hausman Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Hausman Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to the Hausman Declaration)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #34 .(Michael, William)
January 31, 2022 Filing 38 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Paul Meyer in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 to the Meyer Declaration, #2 Attachment 2 to the Meyer Declaration, #3 Attachment 3 to the Meyer Declaration)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #34 .(Michael, William)
January 31, 2022 Filing 37 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Sugene Kim in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K to the Kim Declaration, #2 Exhibit L to the Jang Declaration, #3 Exhibit M to the Jang Declaration, #4 Exhibit N to the Jang Declaration, #5 Exhibit O to the Jang Declaration)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #34 .(Michael, William)
January 31, 2022 Filing 36 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Moonbong Jang in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Jang Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to the Jang Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to the Jang Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to the Jang Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to the Jang Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to the Jang Declaration, #7 Exhibit G to the Jang Declaration, #8 Exhibit H to the Jang Declaration, #9 Exhibit I to the Jang Declaration, #10 Exhibit J to the Jang Declaration)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #34 .(Michael, William)
January 31, 2022 Filing 35 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted]. . Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #34 .(Michael, William)
January 31, 2022 Filing 34 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from William B. Michael dated January 31, 2022. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc...(Michael, William)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: granting #29 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. In light of LGE's filings, Dolby may file a brief not to exceed 35 pages. LG may reply up to 12 pages. There is no extension of time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/26/2022) (ama)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, the parties hereby stipulate and agree as follows: Dolby shall file unredacted versions of its memorandum of law in opposition to LGE's motion for a TRO/PI and associated papers under seal on January 31, 2022, along with a letter motion to seal setting forth the grounds for sealing and proposed redacted versions of its memorandum of law and associated papers. LGE will then examine Dolby's filings for confidential information, and will provide Dolby with any changes to the proposed redactions by no later than 5 PM EST on February 7, 2022. The parties shall meet and confer to agree on the scope of proposed redactions and, once agreed, Dolby shall then separately file redacted/public versions of its memorandum of law and associated papers. LGE shall file unredacted versions of its reply memorandum of law in further support of its motion for a TRO/PI and associated papers under seal on February 14, 2022, along with a letter motion to seal setting forth the grounds for sealing andproposed redacted versions of its memorandum of law and associated papers. Dolby will then examine LGE's filings for confidential information, and will provide LGE with any changes to the proposed redactions by no later than 5 PM EST on February 21, 2022. The parties shall meet and confer to agree on the scope of proposed redactions and, once agreed, LGE shall then separately file redacted/public versions of its memorandum of law and associated papers. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 1/31/2022, Replies due by 2/14/2022.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/26/2022) (ama) Modified on 1/26/2022 (ama).
January 26, 2022 Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Scott T. Weingaertner dated January 26, 2022 re: the letter submitted by the Defendant Dolby entities dated January 25, 2022 #29 . Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Weingaertner, Scott)
January 26, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff is directed to respond to Defendants' 1/25/22 letter by 1/28/22. SO ORDERED. (dgo)
January 25, 2022 Filing 30 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc...(Michael, William)
January 25, 2022 Filing 29 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from William B. Michael dated January 25, 2022. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc...(Michael, William)
January 24, 2022 Filing 28 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
January 19, 2022 Filing 27 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Meredith R. Dearborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
January 12, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Lewis A. Kaplan is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
January 11, 2022 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint #1 served on Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation and Dolby International AB. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc...(Weingaertner, Scott)
January 11, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Meredith R. Dearborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25561682. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 10, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Meredith R. Dearborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25561682. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing).(Dearborn, Meredith)
January 10, 2022 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Other Affiliate Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Other Affiliate Dolby International Holding BV for Dolby International AB; Corporate Parent Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Other Affiliate Dolby Laboratories, Inc. for Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc...(Nyarady, Catherine)
January 10, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Darren Wright Johnson on behalf of Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc...(Johnson, Darren)
January 10, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Nyarady on behalf of Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc...(Nyarady, Catherine)
January 10, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Baly Michael on behalf of Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc...(Michael, William)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Court notes that the two proposed stipulations incorrectly filed in No. 21-mc-862 were signed on behalf of the defendants by a member of the Paul, Weiss firm. Defendants are directed to file, at or before 5 p.m. on January 10, 2022, a notice stated whether Paul, Weiss will appear or be involved in this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/6/2022) (va)
January 6, 2022 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. Related Document Number: #12 ..(Weingaertner, Scott) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 6, 2022 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. Related Document Number: #12 ..(Weingaertner, Scott) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 6, 2022 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. Related Document Number: #12 ..(Weingaertner, Scott) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 6, 2022 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Dr. Allan Shampine in Support re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc...(Weingaertner, Scott)
January 6, 2022 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Dongkwang Kim in Support re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [Redacted], #2 Exhibit 2 [Redacted], #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 [Redacted], #9 Exhibit 9 [Redacted], #10 Exhibit 10 [Redacted], #11 Exhibit 11 [Redacted]).(Weingaertner, Scott)
January 6, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted]. [Redacted]. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc...(Weingaertner, Scott)
January 6, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted]. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc...(Weingaertner, Scott) (Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing.)
January 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #16 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
January 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #18 Proposed Order #17 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Logsdon on behalf of LG Electronics, Inc...(Logsdon, Laura)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Robert Wisnieff on behalf of LG Electronics, Inc...(Wisnieff, Matthew)
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Paul Padro on behalf of LG Electronics, Inc...(Padro, John)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Hysom Suggs on behalf of LG Electronics, Inc...(Suggs, David)
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raj Suresh Gandesha on behalf of LG Electronics, Inc...(Gandesha, Raj)
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert A. Milne on behalf of LG Electronics, Inc...(Milne, Robert)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Thomas Weingaertner on behalf of LG Electronics, Inc...(Weingaertner, Scott)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent LG Corporation for LG Electronics, Inc.. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc...(Weingaertner, Scott)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (vf) (pc).
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 465401291611)Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.(vf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2022: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G, #8 Ex H, #9 Ex I, #10 Ex J, #11 Ex K, #12 Ex L, #13 Ex M, #14 Ex N) (pc). (Attachment 7 replaced on 1/5/2022) (pc).
January 4, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dolby Laboratories, Inc. (vf)
January 4, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dolby International AB. (vf)
January 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER TO FILE REDACTED COMPLAINT FILED IN 21-MC-862. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc. (vf)
January 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
January 4, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation. (vf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LG Electronics, Inc. v. Dolby Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LG Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Thomas Weingaertner
Represented By: David Hysom Suggs
Represented By: John Paul Padro
Represented By: Laura Logsdon
Represented By: Matthew Robert Wisnieff
Represented By: Raj Suresh Gandesha
Represented By: Robert A. Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolby Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Nyarady
Represented By: Meredith Richardson Dearborn
Represented By: William Baly Michael
Represented By: Darren Wright Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolby International AB
Represented By: Catherine Nyarady
Represented By: Meredith Richardson Dearborn
Represented By: William Baly Michael
Represented By: Darren Wright Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation
Represented By: Catherine Nyarady
Represented By: Meredith Richardson Dearborn
Represented By: William Baly Michael
Represented By: Darren Wright Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?