Zurich American Insurance Company v. Great Northern Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00050
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Anthony J. Zarillo dated March 1, 2022., #1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to move or answer the Complaint is hereby ADJOURNED until March 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Great Northern Insurance Company answer due 3/21/2022. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/1/2022) (tg)
March 1, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Anthony J. Zarillo dated March 1, 2022. Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company..(Zarillo, Anthony)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Anthony J. Zarillo, Jr. dated February 8, 2022., #1 Complaint,. Application GRANTED. Defendant must answer or move to dismiss the Complaint not later than March 7, 2022. The Initial Pre-Trial Conference currently scheduled for Friday, March 4, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. is hereby ADJOURNED until Friday, April 15, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. Pre-conference submissions are due not later than Thursday, April 7, 2022. Call-in information can be found at the Court's order at Docket 6. SO ORDERED. Great Northern Insurance Company answer due 3/7/2022. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/8/2022) (tg)
February 8, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Anthony J. Zarillo, Jr. dated February 8, 2022. Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company..(Zarillo, Anthony)
February 8, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 4/15/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (tg)
February 3, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Buchanan on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company..(Buchanan, Katherine)
February 3, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cara Connell Vecchione on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company..(Vecchione, Cara)
February 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Joseph Zarillo on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company..(Zarillo, Anthony)
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint, served. Great Northern Insurance Company served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company..(Wiesner, Noah)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noah Michael Wiesner on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company..(Wiesner, Noah)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888- 363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 0050. Initial Conference set for 3/4/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/6/2022) (tg)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Great Northern Insurance Company..(pc)
January 5, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
January 5, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 5, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, a Swiss corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, a Swiss corporation for Zurich American Insurance Company. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company..(Adams, Steven)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Great Northern Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company..(Adams, Steven)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Adams, Steven)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Great Northern Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25539703)Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Notice of Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 Underlying Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 Third Party Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 Subcontract, #5 Exhibit 5 Purchase Order).(Adams, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Great Northern Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Gary Adams
Represented By: Noah Michael Wiesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Zarillo
Represented By: Cara Connell Vecchione
Represented By: Katherine Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?