Hernandez v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Hernandez
Defendant: The City of New York, Det. Yeraldy Bonifacio, Undercover #332, P.O.s John and Jane Doe #1-10 and City of New York
Case Number: 1:2022cv00504
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew B. Spears on behalf of City of New York..(Spears, Andrew)
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. City of New York served on 2/15/2022, answer due 3/8/2022. Service was accepted by Email. Document filed by Jesus Hernandez..(Weber, Rose)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. Yeraldy Bonifacio served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022; Undercover #332 served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. Service was accepted by Community Assistant Giorgia Bono. Document filed by Jesus Hernandez..(Weber, Rose)
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yeraldy Bonifacio, City of New York, Undercover #332..(gp)
January 20, 2022 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(jpt)
January 20, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 20, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 20, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
January 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rose Minna Weber. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John and Jane Doe #1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY OF NEW YORK, DET. YERALDY BONIFACIO, UNDERCOVER #332, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jesus Hernandez..(Weber, Rose) Modified on 1/20/2022 (sj). Modified on 1/20/2022 (gp).
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weber, Rose)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yeraldy Bonifacio, P.O.s John and Jane Doe #1-10, The City of New York, Undercover #332. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25608295)Document filed by Jesus Hernandez..(Weber, Rose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Hernandez
Represented By: Rose Minna Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Yeraldy Bonifacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Undercover #332
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O.s John and Jane Doe #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Andrew B. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?