Upsolve, Inc. et al v. James
Plaintiff: Upsolve, Inc. and Rev. John Udo-Okon
Defendant: Letitia James
Amicus Curiae: Institute for Justice, NAACP, NAACP New York State Conference, National Center for Access to Justice, Law Professors, Rebecca L. Sandefur and Advocate Amici
Case Number: 1:2022cv00627
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 89 Letter, filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Contents noted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/3/2023) (ks)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Plaintiff Upsolve, Inc., by and through counsel, Robert McNamara dated 12/21/22 re: Updates to the American Justice Movements Training Guide. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(McNamara, Robert)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR THE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, that the law firm of the Institute of Justice, including attorney Robert J. McNamara, shall be substituted in place and instead of the law firm of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, including attorneys Gregory Silbert, Zachary Tripp, Robert Niles-Weed, Elena De Santis, and Liz Grefrath, as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Upsolve Inc. and Rev. John Udo-Okon in the above captioned matter. Attorney Robert Niles-Weed; Gregory Stewart Silbert; Zachary Tripp; Elena De Santis and Elizabeth Grefrath-Sessions terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/30/2022) (jca)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Morris on behalf of Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Morris, Brian)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert McNamara on behalf of Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(McNamara, Robert)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 82 Motion for Brian A. Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 81 Motion for Robert J. McNamara to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 81 MOTION for Robert J. McNamara to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27015147. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 82 MOTION for Brian A. Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27015261. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for Brian A. Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27015261. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (OH), # 2 Affidavit of Brian Morris in support of pro hac vice application, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission pro hac vice).(Morris, Brian)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION for Robert J. McNamara to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27015147. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (VA), # 2 Affidavit of Robert McNamara in support of Application for Admission pro hac vice, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission pro hac vice).(McNamara, Robert)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 79 Letter Motion to Stay re: 79 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Stay all deadlines pending resolution of the Second Circuit appeal addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Gregory Silbert dated July 13, 2022. The matter is stayed pending the resolution of Defendant's appeal in the Second Circuit. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/13/2022) (ate)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Stay all deadlines pending resolution of the Second Circuit appeal addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Gregory Silbert dated July 13, 2022. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: denying 76 Motion to Intervene. While Rosenberg is free to asserthis claim in a standalone lawsuit, he will not be permitted to intervene in this case. Therefore, his motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at ECF Number 76. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/27/2022) (ama)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from 68 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Letitia James. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26312525. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Lawson, Matthew)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 77 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,..(nd)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 77 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Letitia James were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(nd)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 EDWIN ROSENBERG'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF (E.C.F. NO. 69) ORDER DENYING ROSENBERG'S MOTION FOR PERMISSIVE INTERVENTION TO CORRECT A CLEAR ERROR. Document filed by Erwin Rosenberg, proposed intervenor.(sc)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 73 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Motion for attorneys' fees may be filed 14 days after final judgment is entered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/7/2022) (tg)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 70 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 70 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Matthew J. Lawson dated May 31, 2022., 1 Complaint. Defendant's time to answer is extended to July 15, 2022. SO ORDERED. Letitia James answer due 7/15/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/2/2022) (kv)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Gregory Silbert dated June 6, 2022. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: granting 71 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The time to submit the CCMP is extended to July 15, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/02/2022) (ama)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Civil Case Management Plan addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Gregory Silbert dated June 1, 2022. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Matthew J. Lawson dated May 31, 2022. Document filed by Letitia James..(Lawson, Matthew)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: denying 63 Motion to Intervene; denying 64 Motion to Intervene. For the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion granting Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction, Rosenberg seeks much broader relief than Plaintiffs, and is not similarly situated. See ECF No. 68 at 17 n.6. His intervention would deeply complicate the issues presented and delay the proceedings. Therefore, his motion to intervene is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at ECF Numbers 63 and 64. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/25/2022) (ama)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION & ORDER re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc.. Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is GRANTED. The parties are directed to jointly submit a Civil Case Management Plan in accordance with the Court's Individual Practices by June 3, 2022. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at ECF Number 5. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/24/2022) (ks)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Oral Argument proceeding held on 5/12/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Oral Argument held on 5/12/2022 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/14/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: 64 MOTION to Intervene., 63 MOTION to Intervene. . Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ERWIN ROSENBERG'S AMENDED MOTION FOR PERMISSIVE INTERVENTION.(sc) Modified on 5/24/2022 (sc).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Oral Argument held on 5/12/2022 re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc.. REMARK: Counsel for both sides appeared. The Court heard argument from both sides and will render a decision on the request for a PI in due time. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Raquel Robbles) (dgo)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order CALENDAR ENTRY **REMINDER**: Oral Argument scheduled to go forward today: Thursday, May 12, 2022 @ 11:30 AM, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy). (dgo)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ERWIN ROSENBERG'S MOTION FOR PERMISSIVE INTERVENTION, re: to Intervene purs. to Rule 24(b).(sc)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Grefrath-Sessions on behalf of Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Grefrath-Sessions, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 59 . The requested extension to May 2, 2022 is granted. Oral argument will be held on Thursday, May 12, 2022 at 11:30 AM in courtroom 14-C. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Extension of time to submit a reply in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction) addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Gregory Silbert dated April 18, 2022., LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument (Court schedule oral argument on the Motion) addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Gregory Silbert dated April 18, 2022. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Letitia James..(Lawson, Matthew)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . On Behalf of Amici Curiae Consumer Law Experts, Civil Legal Services Organizations and Civil Rights Organizations ("Advocate Amici"). Document filed by Advocate Amici..(Brinckerhoff, Matthew)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: granting 55 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Advocate Amici may file their brief by April 13, 2022. SO ORDERED. Brief due by 4/13/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/17/2022) (ama)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Matthew D. Brinckerhoff dated 3/17/2022. Document filed by Advocate Amici..(Brinckerhoff, Matthew)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew D. Brinckerhoff on behalf of Advocate Amici..(Brinckerhoff, Matthew)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Matthew J. Lawson dated March 16, 2022 re: Independent Third Parties Who May Wish to File an Amicus Curiae Brief. Document filed by Letitia James..(Lawson, Matthew)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: The Court is in receipt of multiple Amicus Curiae briefs and they are deemed accepted by the Court. Any further Amicus Cariae briefs are due no later than March 28, 2022. The Defendant's opposition is due by April 18, 2022. SO ORDERED.(dgo)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Gregory Silbert dated March 11, 2022 re: Independent Third Parties. Document filed by Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Robert J. McNamara to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 43 Motion for Paul M. Sherman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Andrew T. Nguyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 41 Motion for David Halleck Fry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The requested three week extension to file an opposition after the amicus briefs are filed is granted. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/4/2022) (ks)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 41 MOTION for David Halleck Fry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25809936. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 43 MOTION for Paul M. Sherman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25811597. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 42 MOTION for Andrew T. Nguyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25810234. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Response to the Court's Request for a Briefing Schedule on the Amicus Brief Filed by the Institute for Justice addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Matthew J. Lawson dated March 3, 2022. Document filed by Letitia James..(Lawson, Matthew)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Institute for Justice..(Aronin, William)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Robert J. McNamara to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25811705. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Institute for Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Robert J. McNamara in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 3 Text of Proposed Order).(McNamara, Robert)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Paul M. Sherman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25811597. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Institute for Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Paul M. Sherman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 3 Text of Proposed Order).(Sherman, Paul)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Andrew T. Nguyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25810234. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Law Professors. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit Of Andrew T. Nguyen, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order).(Nguyen, Andrew)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for David Halleck Fry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25809936. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Law Professors. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David H. Fry in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac vice).(Fry, David)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DECLARATION of Peter Karanjia in Support re: 38 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of Rebecca L. Sandefur in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Rebecca L. Sandefur..(Karanjia, Peter)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 38 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of Rebecca L. Sandefur in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. . Document filed by Rebecca L. Sandefur..(Karanjia, Peter)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of Rebecca L. Sandefur in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Rebecca L. Sandefur. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order).(Karanjia, Peter)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Karanjia on behalf of Rebecca L. Sandefur..(Karanjia, Peter)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: granting 34 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief. ORDERED, that parties shall file letter by March 18, 2022 containing suggested independent third parties, if any, who should be asked to file briefs regarding the legal and practical effects of applying New York's Unauthorized Practice of Law rules to the proposed activities at issue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/02/2022) (ama)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 34 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . . Document filed by Law Professors..(St. John, Richard)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by Law Professors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Brief of Amici Curiae, # 2 Text of Proposed Order).(St. John, Richard)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Christopher St. John on behalf of Law Professors..(St. John, Richard)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Joseph R. Schottenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Sarah H. Sloan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Jodie C. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 23 MOTION for Sarah H. Sloan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25799971. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 24 MOTION for Joseph R. Schottenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25799955. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 22 MOTION for Jodie C. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25799502. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 27 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . . Document filed by National Center for Access to Justice..(Udell, David)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of David S. Udell in Support re: 27 MOTION to File Amicus Brief .. Document filed by National Center for Access to Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit B - Disclosure Statement, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order).(Udell, David)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by National Center for Access to Justice..(Udell, David)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 25 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . . Document filed by NAACP, NAACP New York State Conference..(Rubens, Daniel)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by NAACP, NAACP New York State Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Curiae Brief).(Rubens, Daniel)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Joseph R. Schottenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25799955. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by NAACP, NAACP New York State Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order).(Schottenfeld, Joseph)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Sarah H. Sloan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25799971. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by NAACP, NAACP New York State Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sarah H. Sloan in Support, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing - DC, # 3 Certificate of Good Standing - NY, # 4 Text of Proposed Order).(Sloan, Sarah)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Jodie C. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25799502. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by NAACP, NAACP New York State Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jodie C. Liu in Support, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing - NY, # 3 Text of Proposed Order).(Liu, Jodie)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Adam Rubens on behalf of NAACP, NAACP New York State Conference..(Rubens, Daniel)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: There is no need for a pre-motion conference. The Institute For Justice may file their amicus brief. The parties are directed to meet and confer on a briefing schedule. The proposed schedule is due by March 3, 2022. SO ORDERED.(dgo)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from William R. Aronin, Counsel for Amicus Curiae Institute for Justice dated February 25, 2022 re: Pre-Motion Conference Request. Document filed by Institute for Justice..(Aronin, William)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William R. Aronin on behalf of Institute for Justice..(Aronin, William)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Zachary D. Tripp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joseph Lawson on behalf of Letitia James..(Lawson, Matthew)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Scheduling Conference held on 2/1/2022. REMARK: All counsel of record on the docket appeared for the parties. The Court set the following schedules: The Defendant's reply to the PI is due by March 11, 2022. Replies are due by March 28, 2022. Defendant's Answer deadline is extended to 10-days after a decision on the PI.See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Kris Sellin) (dgo)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Notice of Conference served on Defendant Letitia James, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of New York on 01/28/2022. Service was accepted by Lorraine Wright, Legal Secretary. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Letitia James served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. Service was accepted by Lorraine Wright, Legal Secretary. Document filed by Upsolve, Inc.; Rev. John Udo-Okon..(Silbert, Gregory)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Letitia James. (sj)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gregory Stewart Silbert to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Conference: A Scheduling Conference is scheduled to go forward on: Tuesday, February 1, 2022 @ 3:00 PM, via teleconference before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Dial-in: 888-363-4749. Access: 8539662. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this notice on the Defendant. If the date is not convenient, either party can e-mail three (3) mutually convenient dates to the Courtroom Deputy at: David_C_Gonzalez@nysd.uscourts.gov ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By: David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy).(dgo)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Tripp on behalf of Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Tripp, Zachary)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Zachary D. Tripp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25631647. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support, # 2 Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, # 4 Text of Proposed Order).(Tripp, Zachary)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elena De Santis on behalf of Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(De Santis, Elena)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Niles-Weed on behalf of Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Niles-Weed, Robert)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Stewart Silbert on behalf of Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Gregory Silbert in Support re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Rohan Pavuluri Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Rev. John Udo-Okon Declaration (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit 2 -Rev. John Udo-Okon Declaration (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit 2 - Rev. John Udo-Okon Declaration (Part 3), # 5 Exhibit 3 - Professor Tashi Lhewa Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Professor Pamela Foohey Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5 - William "Tyler" Evertsen Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 6 - Liz Jurado Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 7 - Christopher Lepre Declaration).(Silbert, Gregory)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory) Modified on 1/26/2022 (sj).
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rev. John Udo-Okon, Upsolve, Inc...(Silbert, Gregory)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Silbert, Gregory)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Letitia James. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25630458)Document filed by Upsolve, Inc., Rev. John Udo-Okon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Answer Form, # 2 Exhibit B - Training Guide).(Silbert, Gregory)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 11 MOTION for Zachary D. Tripp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25631647. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upsolve, Inc. et al v. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Upsolve, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Tripp
Represented By: Elena De Santis
Represented By: Robert Niles-Weed
Represented By: Gregory Stewart Silbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev. John Udo-Okon
Represented By: Zachary Tripp
Represented By: Elena De Santis
Represented By: Robert Niles-Weed
Represented By: Gregory Stewart Silbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letitia James
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Institute for Justice
Represented By: William R. Aronin
Represented By: Paul Sherman
Represented By: Robert McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NAACP
Represented By: Daniel Adam Rubens
Represented By: Jodie Cheng Liu
Represented By: Joseph Schottenfeld
Represented By: Sarah Hartman Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NAACP New York State Conference
Represented By: Daniel Adam Rubens
Represented By: Jodie Cheng Liu
Represented By: Joseph Schottenfeld
Represented By: Sarah Hartman Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Center for Access to Justice
Represented By: David Stuart Udell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Law Professors
Represented By: Richard Christopher St. John
Represented By: Andrew Nguyen
Represented By: David Halleck Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rebecca L. Sandefur
Represented By: Peter Karanjia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Advocate Amici
Represented By: Matthew D. Brinckerhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?