Curran-Groome v. City Of New York et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Curran-Groome
Defendant: The City Of New York,, Commissioner Dermot Shea, New York City Police Department, Chief of Department Terence Monahan, P.O. Katherine Tejada, John and Jane Does # 1-2, City of New York and NYPD Assistant Chief Kenneth Lehr
Case Number: 1:2022cv00710
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #20 Letter Motion for Discovery; denying #20 Letter Motion for Conference re: #20 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Discovery requesting that the Court remove the case from the 1983 Plan and direct Defendants to conduct a conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) the week of March 28, 2022 addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from ElenFIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference requesting that Court schedule an Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Elena Cohen dated March 15, 2022. Plaintiff's request to remove this case from the 1983 Plan under SDNY Local Civil Rule 83.10 is denied. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/16/2022) (tg)
March 15, 2022 Filing 20 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Discovery requesting that the Court remove the case from the 1983 Plan and direct Defendants to conduct a conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) the week of March 28, 2022 addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Elena Cohen dated March 15, 2022., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference requesting that Court schedule an Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Elena Cohen dated March 15, 2022. Document filed by Elizabeth Curran-Groome..(Cohen, Elena)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion to Substitute Attorney. This request is granted. The Clerk is respectfully directed to terminate Andrew Owen as attorney of record in this case. SO ORDERED. Attorney Andrew Galway Owen terminated. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/7/2022) (tg)
March 7, 2022 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Andrew Owen, New Attorney: Shannon Riordan addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Andrew Owen dated 3/7/22. Document filed by City of New York..(Owen, Andrew)
February 25, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gideon Orion Oliver on behalf of Elizabeth Curran-Groome..(Oliver, Gideon)
February 9, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,, Amended Complaint,,, Amended Complaint,, served. Kenneth Lehr served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. Service was accepted by Bono Giorgio. Document filed by Elizabeth Curran-Groome..(Green, Remy)
February 4, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Remy Green on behalf of Elizabeth Curran-Groome..(Green, Remy)
February 3, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon Riordan on behalf of City of New York..(Riordan, Shannon)
February 3, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth Lehr. (sj)
February 2, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenneth Lehr, re: #11 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Elizabeth Curran-Groome..(Massimi, Jessica)
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #6 Amended Complaint,,, against City of New York, John and Jane Does # 1-2(Individually), John and Jane Does # 1-2(as Police Officers), Kenneth Lehr, Terence Monahan(Commander of NYPD Patrol Borough Bronx, as a Police Officer), Terence Monahan(Commander of NYPD Patrol Borough Bronx, Individually), New York City Police Department, Dermot Shea, Katherine Tejada(Shield # 6752, Tax ID # 953474, Individually), Katherine Tejada(Shield # 6752, Tax ID # 953474, as a Police Officer) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Elizabeth Curran-Groome. Related document: #6 Amended Complaint,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, City's Written Consent to Amendment Pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2)).(Massimi, Jessica)
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elena Louisa Cohen on behalf of Elizabeth Curran-Groome..(Cohen, Elena)
February 2, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jessica Massimi to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; all Defendants in all capacities must be selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
February 2, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jessica Massimi to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 1, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenneth Lehr, re: #8 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Elizabeth Curran-Groome..(Massimi, Jessica)
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #6 Amended Complaint against City of New York, John and Jane Does # 1-2(Individually), Kenneth Lehr, Terence Monahan(Commander of NYPD Patrol Borough Bronx, as a Police Officer), New York City Police Department, Dermot Shea, Katherine Tejada(Shield # 6752, Tax ID # 953474, Individually) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Elizabeth Curran-Groome. Related document: #6 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, City's Written Consent to Amendment Pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2)).(Massimi, Jessica) Modified on 2/2/2022 (sj).
February 1, 2022 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYPD Assistant Chief Kenneth Lehr, re: #6 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Elizabeth Curran-Groome..(Massimi, Jessica) Modified on 2/1/2022 (vf).
February 1, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of New York, John and Jane Does # 1-2(Individually), John and Jane Does # 1-2(as Police Officers), Terence Monahan(Commander of NYPD Patrol Borough Bronx, as a Police Officer), Terence Monahan(Commander of NYPD Patrol Borough Bronx, Individually), New York City Police Department, Dermot Shea, Katherine Tejada(Shield # 6752, Tax ID # 953474, Individually), Katherine Tejada(Shield # 6752, Tax ID # 953474, as a Police Officer), Kenneth Lehr with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Elizabeth Curran-Groome. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, City's Written Consent to Amendment Pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2)).(Massimi, Jessica) Modified on 2/1/2022 (vf).
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Massimi on behalf of Elizabeth Curran-Groome..(Massimi, Jessica)
February 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jessica Massimi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kenneth Lehr. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
February 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jessica Massimi to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
February 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jessica Massimi to RE-FILE re: Document No. #6 Amended Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
January 31, 2022 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(jpt)
January 30, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elena Louisa Cohen on behalf of Elizabeth Curran-Groome..(Cohen, Elena)
January 28, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
January 28, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 27, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of removal and civil cover sheet served on plaintiff, Monahan and Tejada on 1/27/22. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York City Police Department, Dermot Shea, The City Of New York,..(Owen, Andrew)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Owen, Andrew)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 817450/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25647505).Document filed by Dermot Shea, The City Of New York,, New York City Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavits of service, #3 Exhibit Consents to removal).(Owen, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curran-Groome v. City Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Curran-Groome
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: Jessica Massimi
Represented By: Remy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Of New York,
Represented By: Andrew Galway Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Dermot Shea
Represented By: Andrew Galway Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department
Represented By: Andrew Galway Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Department Terence Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Katherine Tejada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does # 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Andrew Galway Owen
Represented By: Shannon Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Assistant Chief Kenneth Lehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?