Raven Scores, Limited v. DCR Finance Corp.
Plaintiff: Raven Scores, Limited
Defendant: DCR Finance Corp.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00739
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Raven Scores, Limited..(Reina, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: In the order scheduling the initial pretrial conference in this matter, the parties were directed to submit a joint letter via ECF and to email a joint proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order to Chambers by no later than March 23, 2022. Dkt. No. 5. The Court has not received the parties' submissions. The parties are directed to submit their joint letter via ECF and to email their joint proposed Case Management Plan to Chambers forthwith, and in no event later than March 25, 2022. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on Defendant and to retain proof of service. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/24/2022) (js)
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on DCR Finance Corp/Harvard Business Service Inc. on March 1, 2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Raven Scores, Limited..(Reina, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on DCR Finance Corp/Harvard Business Service Inc. on March 1, 2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by Raven Scores, Limited..(Reina, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: March 23, 2022. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/30/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/31/2022) (jca)
January 31, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Reina, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DCR Finance Corp. (vf)
January 31, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 31, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Francis Reina. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
January 31, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Francis Reina. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (vf)
January 31, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
January 31, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DCR Finance Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Raven Scores, Limited..(Reina, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DCR Finance Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25649776)Document filed by Raven Scores, Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-B).(Reina, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raven Scores, Limited v. DCR Finance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raven Scores, Limited
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCR Finance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?