Bucci v. Network Recovery Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Caroline Bucci
Defendant: Network Recovery Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00854
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Defendant's unopposed request is granted. The Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") scheduled for April 5, 2022 is adjourned to May 17, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall submit their pre-IPTC joint letter and the proposed case management plan and scheduling order by May 10, 2022. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge John P. Cronan.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/28/2022) (jca)
March 28, 2022 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lori A. Medley dated March 28, 2022. Document filed by Network Recovery Services, Inc...(Medley, Lori)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lori A. Medley dated March 3, 2022. Defendant's request is granted. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by April 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Network Recovery Services, Inc. answer due 4/21/2022. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/4/2022) (jca)
March 3, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lori A. Medley dated March 3, 2022. Document filed by Network Recovery Services, Inc...(Medley, Lori)
March 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Stuart Frank on behalf of Network Recovery Services, Inc...(Frank, James)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lori A Medley on behalf of Network Recovery Services, Inc...(Medley, Lori)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/5/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/1/2022) (jca)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Network Recovery Services, Inc.. (vf)
February 2, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Karl Jones. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Caroline Bucci. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
February 2, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 2, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 2, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Network Recovery Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Caroline Bucci..(Jones, Joseph)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jones, Joseph)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Network Recovery Services, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25665419)Document filed by Caroline Bucci..(Jones, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bucci v. Network Recovery Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Bucci
Represented By: Joseph Karl Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Recovery Services, Inc.
Represented By: James Stuart Frank
Represented By: Lori A Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?