GATX Corporation v. Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP
Plaintiff: GATX Corporation
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP
Case Number: 1:2022cv00910
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James L. Messenger on behalf of Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP..(Messenger, James)
March 30, 2022 Filing 20 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by GATX Corporation..(Franz, Michael)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for James L. Messenger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Michael T. Franz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 21, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for James L. Messenger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25884142. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
March 18, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for James L. Messenger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25884142. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Siachos, Peter)
March 18, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Michael T. Franz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
March 17, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Michael T. Franz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by GATX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Florida, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Michigan, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #5 Proposed Order).(Franz, Michael)
March 15, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on April 6, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone. Counsel shall call the Court at (877) 411-9748 and use access code 3029857#. PLAINTIFF, OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) SHALL NOTIFY ALL PARTIES IN WRITING AND PROVIDE ALL PARTIES WITH A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE ATTACHED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER, UNLESS THE CASE HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH EVENT COUNSEL FOR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT(S) SHALL PROVIDE SUCH NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES. Initial Conference set for 4/6/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos..(ama)
March 14, 2022 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan GP LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan GP LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Inc. for Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP. Document filed by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP..(Siachos, Peter)
March 14, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP..(Siachos, Peter)
March 14, 2022 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP..(Siachos, Peter) Modified on 3/14/2022 (lb).
March 14, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Peter George Siachos to RE-FILE Document #12 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
March 3, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #11 SECOND MOTION for Michael T. Franz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificates of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida, Illinois, and Michigan. We do not accept certificates from a state bar registrar or disciplinary commission for these states.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
March 2, 2022 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SECOND MOTION for Michael T. Franz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by GATX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Florida, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - Michigan, #5 Proposed Order).(Franz, Michael) Modified on 3/3/2022 (bcu).
February 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #10 MOTION for Michael T. Franz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25784860. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Courts of Florida, Illinois, and Michigan. We do accept certificates from a state bar registrar or disciplinary commisson.; missing Proposed Order; Attorney Affidavit not signed or notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
February 25, 2022 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael T. Franz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25784860. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by GATX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Certificate of Good Standing).(Franz, Michael) Modified on 2/28/2022 (bcu).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ENTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the attorneys for the undersigned parties to this action, that the time for defendant Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed in this action is continued to and including March 14, 2022. SO ORDERED., Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP answer due 3/14/2022. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/22/2022) (ama)
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP..(Siachos, Peter)
February 8, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP served on 2/7/2022, answer due 2/28/2022. Service was accepted by Mary Fink, Registered Agent. Document filed by GATX Corporation..(Strauss, James)
February 4, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP..(lal)
February 3, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by GATX Corporation..(Strauss, James)
February 3, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James Mitchell Strauss. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
February 3, 2022 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
February 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney James Mitchell Strauss to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Filing court omitted on PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 3, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kinder Morgan Energy Partners LLP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by GATX Corporation..(Strauss, James) Modified on 2/3/2022 (sj).
February 2, 2022 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GATX Corporation..(Strauss, James)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Strauss, James)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25676276)Document filed by GATX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I Contract between GATX and Kinder Morgan, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 David Hardy Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 GATX Answer in David Hardy Lawsuit, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Tender Letter in David Hardy Lawsuit, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 -- Kinder Morgan denial of tender in David Hardy Lawsuit, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Timothy Hardy Lawsuit, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - GATX Answer in Timothy Hardy Lawsuit, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Tender Letter in Timothy Hardy Lawsuit, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 Kinder Morgan denial of tender in Timothy Hardy Lawsuit).(Strauss, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GATX Corporation v. Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GATX Corporation
Represented By: James Mitchell Strauss
Represented By: Michael Thomas Franz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LLP
Represented By: Peter George Siachos
Represented By: James L. Messenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?