Hazlett, Sr. et al v. Philips RS North America LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edward J. Hazlett, Sr. and Andrea K Hazlett
Defendant: Philips RS North America LLC, Philips North America LLC and Philips Holding USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00976
Filed: February 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Western District of Pennsylvania acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:22-cv-00331, filed on 02/22/2022. (sjo)
February 22, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Western District of Pennsylvania. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/17/2022) (sjo)
February 22, 2022 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Western District of Pennsylvania (sjo)
February 8, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Philips RS North America LLC. (vf)
February 8, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Philips North America LLC. (vf)
February 8, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Philips Holding USA, Inc.. (vf)
February 8, 2022 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrea K Hazlett, Edward J. Hazlett, Sr.. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (vf)
February 8, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Paul D. Rheingold to Document No. 6 and 7 belonging to case 1:22-cv-991 that was incorrectly filed on 2/07/2022 in case 1:22-cv-976. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the request for issuance of summons was filed in the wrong case. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
February 8, 2022 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS HOLDING USA, INC., re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrea K Hazlett, Edward J. Hazlett, Sr. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (vf)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/19/2022 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/7/2022) (ks)
February 7, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrea K Hazlett, Edward J. Hazlett, Sr...(Rheingold, Paul)
February 7, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrea K Hazlett, Edward J. Hazlett, Sr...(Rheingold, Paul)
February 7, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS HOLDING USA, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrea K Hazlett, Edward J. Hazlett, Sr...(Rheingold, Paul)
February 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Paul D. Rheingold to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil Case Number Error listed on PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
February 3, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrea K Hazlett, Edward J. Hazlett, Sr...(Rheingold, Paul) Modified on 2/4/2022 (vf).
February 3, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrea K Hazlett, Edward J. Hazlett, Sr.(Rheingold, Paul) Modified on 2/4/2022 (vf).
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS HOLDING USA, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrea K Hazlett, Edward J. Hazlett, Sr...(Rheingold, Paul) Modified on 2/4/2022 (vf).
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rheingold, Paul)
February 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philips Holding USA, Inc., Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25681742)Document filed by Edward J. Hazlett, Sr., Andrea K Hazlett..(Rheingold, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazlett, Sr. et al v. Philips RS North America LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Hazlett, Sr.
Represented By: Paul D. Rheingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea K Hazlett
Represented By: Paul D. Rheingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips RS North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Holding USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?