Hill et al v. Philips RS North America LLC et al
Plaintiff: Linda S. Hill and Charles A. Hill
Defendant: Philips RS North America LLC, Philips North America LLC and Philips Holding USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00991
Filed: February 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Western District of Pennsylvania acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:22-cv-00333, filed on 02/22/2022. (sjo)
February 22, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Western District of Pennsylvania. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/17/2022) (sjo)
February 22, 2022 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Western District of Pennsylvania. (sjo)
February 8, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Philips RS North America LLC. (vf)
February 8, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Philips North America LLC. (vf)
February 8, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Philips Holding USA, Inc.. (vf)
February 7, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles A. Hill, Linda S. Hill..(Rheingold, Paul)
February 7, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles A. Hill, Linda S. Hill..(Rheingold, Paul)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS HOLDING USA, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles A. Hill, Linda S. Hill..(Rheingold, Paul)
February 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
February 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rheingold, Paul)
February 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philips Holding USA, Inc., Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25683031)Document filed by Linda S. Hill, Charles A. Hill..(Rheingold, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. Philips RS North America LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda S. Hill
Represented By: Paul D. Rheingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Hill
Represented By: Paul D. Rheingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips RS North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Holding USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?