Santos v. 27 Pizza Cafe Corp. et al
Plaintiff: David Guevara Santos
Defendant: 27 Pizza Cafe Corp. d/b/a Pastafina Pizza, Hassan Ebraheim and 27 Pizza Cafe Corp. doing business as Pastafina Pizza
Case Number: 1:2022cv01114
Filed: February 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Hassan Ebraheim served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. Service was accepted by HASSAN EBRAHEIM. Document filed by David Guevara Santos..(Avshalumov, Roman)
February 23, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. 27 Pizza Cafe Corp. served on 2/18/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky AUTHORIZED AGENT. Document filed by David Guevara Santos..(Avshalumov, Roman)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 27 Pizza Cafe Corp., Hassan Ebraheim. (vf)
February 10, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 10, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 10, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331fl Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act; the County code has been modified to Queens. (vf)
February 9, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of David Guevara Santos..(O'Donnell, James)
February 9, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 27 Pizza Cafe Corp. d/b/a Pastafina Pizza and Hassan Ebraheim, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David Guevara Santos..(Avshalumov, Roman)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Avshalumov, Roman)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 27 Pizza Cafe Corp., Hassan Ebraheim. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25706967)Document filed by David Guevara Santos..(Avshalumov, Roman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. 27 Pizza Cafe Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Guevara Santos
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 27 Pizza Cafe Corp. d/b/a Pastafina Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hassan Ebraheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 27 Pizza Cafe Corp. doing business as Pastafina Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?