Gannon v. 31 Essex Street LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Gannon
Defendant: 31 Essex Street LLC, Party Bus Bakeshop LLC, John Doe 1-X and Corporations 1-X
Case Number: 1:2022cv01134
Filed: February 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #11 MOTION to Strike Document No. #10 . . Document filed by Party Bus Bakeshop LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E-mail to Plaintiff's counsel requesting extension of time to answer, #2 Exhibit B- ECF filing bounce - letter motion for Extension of Time to Answer).(Minsley, Morton)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Summons Returned Executed on Defendant Party Bus Bakeshop LLC. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Morton S. Minsley, Esq. dated March 15, 2022. The Application is Granted. Party Bus Bakeshop LLC answer due 4/14/2022. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/17/2022) (ama)
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike Document No. #10 . Document filed by Stephen Gannon. Responses due by 4/1/2022.(Ford, Adam)
March 16, 2022 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Summons Returned Executed on Defendant Party Bus Bakeshop LLC addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Morton S. Minsley, Esq. dated March 15, 2022. Document filed by Party Bus Bakeshop LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Cases filed by Plaintiff).(Minsley, Morton)
March 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Morton Seth Minsley on behalf of Party Bus Bakeshop LLC..(Minsley, Morton)
February 24, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Party Bus Bakeshop LLC served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Stephen Gannon..(Ford, Adam)
February 24, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. 31 Essex Street LLC served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Stephen Gannon..(Ford, Adam)
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Party Bus Bakeshop LLC..(pc)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 31 Essex Street LLC..(pc)
February 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Adam Douglas Ford. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Corporations 1-X, John Doe 1-X, Stephen Gannon. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
February 10, 2022 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 10, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 10, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 9, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Party Bus Bakeshop LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Gannon..(Ford, Adam)
February 9, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 31 Essex Street LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Gannon..(Ford, Adam)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ford, Adam)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 31 Essex Street LLC, Corporations 1-X, John Doe 1-X, Party Bus Bakeshop LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25712037)Document filed by Stephen Gannon..(Ford, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gannon v. 31 Essex Street LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Gannon
Represented By: Adam Douglas Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 31 Essex Street LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Party Bus Bakeshop LLC
Represented By: Morton Seth Minsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporations 1-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?