Rosales v. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Helen Rosales
Defendant: Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc., Baychester Chicken BG, LLC d/b/a "Popeyes Restaurant", and Yeasher Arafat, Individually
Case Number: 1:2022cv01150
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Wilkens on behalf of Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc...(Wilkens, Kimberly)
March 25, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. served on 2/28/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. Service was accepted by SHARALEA ANDRADE, PARALEGAL AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT. Document filed by Helen Rosales..(Phillips, William)
March 22, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. answer due 4/22/2022. (yv)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 19. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/22/22) (yv)
March 21, 2022 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Littler Mendelson, P.C. dated March 21, 2022. Document filed by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc...(Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel)
March 16, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez on behalf of Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc...(Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel)
March 9, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Yeasher Arafat, Individually served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. Service was accepted by NISHA KARAM, CO-WORKER. Document filed by Helen Rosales..(Phillips, William)
February 22, 2022 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Morgan Mickelsen dated February 22, 2022 re: Proof of Notice to Defendants About Initial Pretrial Conference and Judge's Rules. Document filed by Helen Rosales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Notice to All Defendants).(Mickelsen, Morgan)
February 16, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Helen Rosales on 2/16/2022. Document filed by Baychester Chicken BG, LLC d/b/a "Popeyes Restaurant",..(Long, Kaitlyn)
February 16, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kaitlyn Pelosi Long on behalf of Baychester Chicken BG, LLC d/b/a "Popeyes Restaurant",..(Long, Kaitlyn)
February 16, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance on 2/16/2022. Document filed by Baychester Chicken BG, LLC d/b/a "Popeyes Restaurant",..(Lager, Karen)
February 16, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen M. Lager on behalf of Baychester Chicken BG, LLC d/b/a "Popeyes Restaurant",..(Lager, Karen)
February 16, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Baychester Chicken BG, LLC d/b/a "Popeyes Restaurant", waiver sent on 2/11/2022. Document filed by Baychester Chicken BG, LLC d/b/a "Popeyes Restaurant",..(Long, Kaitlyn)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/25/2022 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/14/2022) (jca)
February 11, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Baychester Chicken BG, LLC d/b/a "Popeyes Restaurant",..(pc)
February 11, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc...(pc)
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yeasher Arafat, Individually..(pc)
February 11, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 11, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 11, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Morgan L Mickelsen on behalf of Helen Rosales..(Mickelsen, Morgan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yeasher Arafat, Individually, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Helen Rosales..(Stevens, Brittany)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Helen Rosales..(Stevens, Brittany)
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Baychester Chicken BG, LLC d/b/a "Popeyes Restaurant", re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Helen Rosales..(Stevens, Brittany)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stevens, Brittany)
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yeasher Arafat, Individually, Baychester Chicken BG, LLC d/b/a "Popeyes Restaurant",, Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25713845)Document filed by Helen Rosales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit B - Letter to the NYCCHR and NYCL).(Stevens, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosales v. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Rosales
Represented By: Morgan L Mickelsen
Represented By: Brittany Alexandra Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez
Represented By: Kimberly Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baychester Chicken BG, LLC d/b/a "Popeyes Restaurant",
Represented By: Karen M. Lager
Represented By: Kaitlyn Pelosi Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yeasher Arafat, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?