Immigrant Defense Project v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: Immigrant Defense Project
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2022cv01153
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Status Report filed by Immigrant Defense Project ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall file a joint letter regarding the status of this action on May 2, 2022. SO ORDERED (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/5/2022) (ks)
April 4, 2022 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Immigrant Defense Project..(Morawetz, Nancy)
March 21, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Connolly, Christopher)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Status Report filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The parties shall submit a joint letter regarding the status of this case no later than April 4, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 3/11/2022) (tg)
March 10, 2022 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Connolly, Christopher)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: No later than March 10, 2022, the parties shall file a joint letter setting forth the parties' intended next steps in this case and a proposed schedule therefor. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 2/24/2022) (js)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: by Immigrant Defense Project, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. IT IS ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/23/2022).(ama)
February 18, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). All Defendants. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Immigrant Defense Project..(Morawetz, Nancy)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Consent under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) for all purposes (including trial). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/15/2022) (ama)
February 15, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
February 15, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
February 15, 2022 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-10660-SDA. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
February 12, 2022 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Morawetz, Nancy)
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(pc)
February 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nancy Babette Morawetz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
February 11, 2022 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-25714502, paid on 2/10/2022..(pc)
February 11, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
February 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nancy Babette Morawetz to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Related case number and judge were omitted from the first page of the Civil Cover Sheet. (pc)
February 11, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 11, 2022 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 20cv10660. (pc)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Immigrant Defense Project..(Morawetz, Nancy)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy Babette Morawetz on behalf of Immigrant Defense Project..(Morawetz, Nancy)
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-10660. Document filed by Immigrant Defense Project..(Morawetz, Nancy)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Morawetz, Nancy) Modified on 2/11/2022 (pc).
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Document filed by Immigrant Defense Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5 and List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 6-9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11-13).(Morawetz, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immigrant Defense Project v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immigrant Defense Project
Represented By: Nancy Babette Morawetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Christopher Kendrick Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?